Welch et al v. Crane Co et al
Plaintiff: David J Welch and Linda Welch
Defendant: Crane Co, Velan Valve Corp and Velan Valve Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00302
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 10-12 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 8/7/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 6/10/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/8/2023, Discovery completed by 4/10/2023, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 5/9/2023, Motions in Limine due by 7/10/2023, Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2023, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 7/31/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10-12. (Olson, Justin)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch.(Olson, Justin)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Trevor J. Mohr on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Mohr, Trevor)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/27/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/4/2022, Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Craig, Kevin)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Velan Valve Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co.(Shaw, G)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Crane Co. (Shaw, G)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Ryan J Groshong added for Crane Co; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Velan Valve Corporation on 3/24/2022, filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Olson, Justin)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Crane Co on 3/18/2022, filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Olson, Justin)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund. Filed by Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MJV)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Richard A. Jones added. (MJV)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Olson, Justin)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund on behalf of Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Firnhaber Oslund, Vanessa)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Bergman, Matthew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7472940), filed by David J Welch, Linda Welch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bergman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch et al v. Crane Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J Welch
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Welch
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?