Sectra Communications AB v. Absolute Software Inc et al
Counter Defendant: Sectra Communications AB
Counter Claimant: Absolute Software Inc and NetMotion Software Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00353
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 94 Counter-Defendants Absolute Software, Inc. and NetMotion Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to #90 Answer to Counterclaim, by Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc.(Durbin, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 93 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Sectra Communications AB, filed by NetMotion Software Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Durbin, Christopher)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Statement of asserted claims and preliminary infringement contentions due 12/8/2022, Statement of preliminary invalidity contentions due 12/28/2022, Reports from expert witnesses regarding Markman issues due 1/24/2023, Joinder of Parties due by 2/9/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2023, Rebuttal expert reports regarding Markman issues due 2/27/2023, Proposed terms and Claim Elements and Preliminary Claim Chart due 3/9/2023, Joint claim chart due 4/7/2023, Opening claim construction briefs due 4/21/2023, Responsive claim construction briefs due 5/5/2023, Markman Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/15/2023, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/14/2023, Motions due by 7/21/2023, Discovery Motions due by 7/13/2023, Discovery completed by 8/14/2023, Dispositive motions due by 9/8/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/3/2023, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 11/13/2023, Motions in Limine due by 11/13/2023, Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/6/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 12/6/2023. (LC)
May 4, 2022 Filing 91 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Squires, William)
April 29, 2022 Filing 90 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #56 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc by Sectra Communications AB.(Squires, William)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/20/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/27/2022. (LC)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re #83 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Samoneh C Kadivar for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #82 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David J Tobin for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #81 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Syed K Fareed for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #80 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin J Meek for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #79 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen M Hash for Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 31, 2022 Filing 83 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samoneh Kadivar FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7496703 (Squires, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 82 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David J. Tobin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7496690 (Squires, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 81 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Syed K. Fareed FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7496687 (Squires, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 80 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin J. Meek FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7496674 (Squires, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 79 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen M. Hash FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7496662 (Squires, William)
March 30, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Randolph Squires, III on behalf of Counter Defendant Sectra Communications AB, Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB. (Squires, William)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re #72 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Orion Armon for Defendants/Counter Claimants Absolute Software Inc and NetMotion Software Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #73 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra Leeper for Defendants/Counter Claimants Absolute Software Inc and NetMotion Software Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re #71 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Reuben H Chen for Defendants/Counter Claimants Absolute Software Inc and NetMotion Software Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #70 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Heidi L. Keefe for Defendants/Counter Claimants Absolute Software Inc and NetMotion Software Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 25, 2022 Filing 73 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra Leeper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7489339 (Durbin, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 72 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Orion Armon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7488986 (Durbin, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 71 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Reuben H. Chen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7488980 (Durbin, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 70 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Heidi L. Keefe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7488953 (Durbin, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc (Durbin, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher B. Durbin on behalf of Defendants Absolute Software Inc, NetMotion Software Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
March 24, 2022 Filing 67 LETTER from Clerk to to counsel re receipt of case from Western District of Texas, (Waco Division) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
March 24, 2022 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
March 23, 2022 Filing 66 Case transferred in from Western District of Texas, (Waco) Case Number 6:21-cv-00759-ADA.
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Sealed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 64 Sealed Document: Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Reuben H. Chen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Request to Transfer to the Austin Division of #63 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. (Chen, Reuben) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc., re #55 Opposed MOTION to Strike #48 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Sectra Communications AB (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reuben Chen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Public version of document filed under seal))(Chen, Reuben) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Sectra Communications AB (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 61 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #54 Claim Construction Brief by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J)(Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion to Substitute. It is ORDERED that ECF No. 42 should be replaced with the Redacted-Public Version that is attached to ECF No. 45 as Exhibit 1. It is further ORDERED that ECF No. 42-1 should be filed with a cover sheet (attached to ECF No. 45 as Exhibit 2) stating that ECF No. 42-1 was filed under seal. Finally, it is ORDERED that ECF No. 42, which was temporarily sealed, should be unsealed. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (WMlc) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph E. Van Tassel. Attorney added for Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Status Report on Motion for Inter-District Transfer by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 11, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Joseph E. Van Tassel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15808731) by on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 57 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Sectra Communications AB by NetMotion Software, Inc., Absolute Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Filing 55 Opposed MOTION to Strike #48 Reply to Response to Motion, by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 54 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #38 Claim Construction Brief by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19)(Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 3/28/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT on Motion for Inter-District Transfer by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 51 Sealed Document: Hydzik Decl iso Mot. to Transfer of #48 Reply to Response to Motion, by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. (Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 50 Sealed Document: exhibit 16-20 of #49 Affidavit in Support, by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20) (Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #48 Reply to Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Alexandra Leeper in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants Absolute Software, Inc.s and Netmotion Software, Inc.s Motion to Transfer by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15)(Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc., re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant NetMotion Software, Inc., Defendant Absolute Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Robert Booker in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants Absolute Software, Inc.s and Netmotion Software, Inc.s Motion to Transfer)(Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 47 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #38 Claim Construction Brief by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Zygmunt Haas, #2 Exhibit B - Random House Unabridged Dictionary, #3 Exhibit C - 37 CFR Part 95 (2001-10-01), #4 Exhibit D - US5568537)(Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Joshua Tobin on behalf of Sectra Communications AB. Attorney David Joshua Tobin added to party Sectra Communications AB(pty:pla) (Tobin, David) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION , MOTION to Substitute Dkt. 42 and Dkt. 42-1 by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - ISO Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 44 Sealed Document: Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue of 042 Response in Opposition to Motion re #30 Motion to Transfer Case of #43 Sealed Document,, by Sectra Communications AB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Englund Declaration, #2 Exhibit 6 ISO Opp'n) (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 43 Sealed Document: Sectra's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue [SEALED EXHIBITS] of #42 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, by Sectra Communications AB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 ISO Opp'n, #2 Exhibit 8 ISO Opp'n, #3 Exhibit 11 ISO Opp'n, #4 Exhibit 12 ISO Opp'n, #5 Exhibit 20 ISO Opp'n, #6 Exhibit 21 ISO Opp'n, #7 Exhibit 22 ISO Opp'n, #8 Exhibit 23 ISO Opp'n, #9 Exhibit 24 ISO Opp'n, #10 Exhibit 26 ISO Opp'n, #11 Exhibit 28 ISO Opp'n, #12 Exhibit 29 ISO Opp'n, #13 Exhibit 33 ISO Opp'n) (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 42 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sectra Communications AB, re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant NetMotion Software, Inc., Defendant Absolute Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Englund Declaration, #2 Affidavit Kadivar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 ISO Opp'n, #4 Exhibit 2 ISO Opp'n, #5 Exhibit 3 ISO Opp'n, #6 Exhibit 4 ISO Opp'n, #7 Exhibit 5 ISO Opp'n, #8 Exhibit 6 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 7 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 8 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 9 ISO Opp'n, #12 Exhibit 10 ISO Opp'n, #13 Exhibit 11 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 12 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 13 ISO Opp'n, #16 Exhibit 14 ISO Opp'n, #17 Exhibit 15 ISO Opp'n, #18 Exhibit 16 ISO Opp'n, #19 Exhibit 17 ISO Opp'n, #20 Exhibit 18 ISO Opp'n, #21 Exhibit 19 ISO Opp'n, #22 Exhibit 20 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 21 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #24 Exhibit 22 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit 23 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 24 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit 25 ISO Opp'n, #28 Exhibit 26 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #29 Exhibit 27 - INTENTIONALLY LEFT BLANK, #30 Exhibit 28 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #31 Exhibit 29 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #32 Exhibit 30 - INTENTIONALLY LEFT BLANK, #33 Exhibit 31 ISO Opp'n, #34 Exhibit 32 ISO Opp'n, #35 Exhibit 33 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #36 Exhibit 34 ISO Opp'n, #37 Exhibit 35 ISO Opp'n, #38 Exhibit 36 ISO Opp'n, #39 Exhibit 37 ISO Opp'n, #40 Exhibit 38 ISO Opp'n, #41 Exhibit 39 ISO Opp'n, #42 Exhibit 40 ISO Opp'n, #43 Exhibit 41 ISO Opp'n)(Hash, Stephen) Modified on 2/16/2022 (jc5). (Main Document 42 replaced on 3/17/2022) (sv). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/17/2022) (sv). Modified on 3/17/2022 (sv). [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Puneet Kohli by Sectra Communications AB. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (WMlc) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Close of Venue Discovery by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. (Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 31, 2022 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Puneet Kohli by Sectra Communications AB. (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 28, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT in Support Declaration of Alexandra Leeper iso Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 28, 2022 Filing 38 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 28, 2022 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 1/26/2022. Case called for Discovery Hearing by zoom. The parties argued their discovery issues. Court heard the issues and made a ruling on each. An Order should be forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(ir) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samoneh Kadivar on behalf of Sectra Communications AB. Attorney Samoneh Kadivar added to party Sectra Communications AB(pty:pla) (Kadivar, Samoneh) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orion Armon on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. Attorney Orion Armon added to party Absolute Software, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Orion Armon added to party NetMotion Software, Inc.(pty:dft) (Armon, Orion) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DISCOVERY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER by Sectra Communications AB re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case Certificate of Conference by Reuben H. Chen on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. (Chen, Reuben) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Transfer Case by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Balam, #2 Declaration of Robert Booker, #3 Declaration of Alexandra Leeper, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Proposed Order)(Leeper, Alexandra) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order by Sectra Communications AB. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc., re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant NetMotion Software, Inc., Defendant Absolute Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Heidi L. Keefe ISO Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plf's Disclosure of Asserted Claims & Preliminary Infringement Contentions)(Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Sectra Communications AB, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant NetMotion Software, Inc., Defendant Absolute Software, Inc. (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT -CASE READINESS by Sectra Communications AB. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Leeper. Attorney added for Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reuben Chen. Attorney added for Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lam Nguyen. Attorney added for Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Reuben Chen, Lam Nguyen and Alexandra Leeper. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Alexandra Leeper ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15269526) by on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Reuben Chen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15269437) by on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Lam Nguyen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15269350) by on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) Extende on 9/2/2021 (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Absolute Software, Inc. and NetMotion Software, Inc. answer due 9/24/2021. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Absolute Software, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; NetMotion Software, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021. (mc5) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Absolute Software, Inc., NetMotion Software, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Absolute Software, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party NetMotion Software, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sectra Communications AB. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sectra Communications AB. NetMotion Software, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sectra Communications AB. Absolute Software, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to NetMotion Software, Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Absolute Software, Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Puneet Kohli on behalf of Sectra Communications AB. Attorney Puneet Kohli added to party Sectra Communications AB(pty:pla) (Kohli, Puneet) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of Sectra Communications AB. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party Sectra Communications AB(pty:pla) (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin J. Meek on behalf of Sectra Communications AB. Attorney Kevin J. Meek added to party Sectra Communications AB(pty:pla) (Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sectra Communications AB. of NetMotion Software, Inc. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sectra Communications AB. of Absolute Software Inc. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15047244), filed by Sectra Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - US7797437, #3 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit 3 - First Notice Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Second Notice Letter)(Hash, Stephen) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]
July 23, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from txwd on 3/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sectra Communications AB v. Absolute Software Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sectra Communications AB
Represented By: David Joshua Tobin
Represented By: Kevin J Meek
Represented By: Puneet Kohli
Represented By: Samoneh Kadivar
Represented By: Stephen M. Hash
Represented By: Syed K. Fareed
Represented By: David J Tobin
Represented By: Samoneh C Kadivar
Represented By: Stephen M Hash
Represented By: Syed K Fareed
Represented By: William Randolph Squires, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Absolute Software Inc
Represented By: Alexandra Leeper
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Joseph E. Van Tassel
Represented By: Lam Nguyen
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Reuben H. Chen
Represented By: Reuben H Chen
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NetMotion Software Inc
Represented By: Alexandra Leeper
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Joseph E. Van Tassel
Represented By: Lam Nguyen
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Reuben H. Chen
Represented By: Reuben H Chen
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?