Bungie Inc v. Does 1-10
Plaintiff: Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation and Bungie Inc
Defendant: John Doe 1-10, John Does 1-10, Nicholas Minor and Lord Nazo
Case Number: 2:2022cv00371
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Nicholas Minor AKA Lord Nazo on 6/23/2022, filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. (Cohen, Akiva)
June 22, 2022 Filing 21 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nicholas Minor. (SB)
June 22, 2022 Filing 20 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Bungie Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Nicholas Minor)(Cohen, Akiva)
June 22, 2022 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nicholas Minor with JURY DEMAND, filed by Bungie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence with "Jacob Averz", #2 Exhibit Correspondence with "Damian Reynolds")(Cohen, Akiva)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Renewed Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to provide the Court with a report on Google's response to the new subpoena and Plaintiff's efforts to identify the John Doe defendants. Plaintiff must make its first report within 45 days from entry of this Order and every 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 EXHIBIT A re #16 Letter by Plaintiff Bungie Inc (Cohen, Akiva)
May 11, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER from Akiva M. Cohen re #11 MOTION for Leave TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA ON GOOGLE, LLC PRIOR TO DISCOVERY CONFERENCE filed by Bungie Inc (Cohen, Akiva)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena without prejudice. The Court suspends the current Rule 26-related deadlines (see Joint Status Report Order (Dkt. No. #14 )), and ORDERS Plaintiff to provide the Court with a report on the status of the existing subpoena compliance efforts. Plaintiff must make its first report within 30 days from entry of this Order and every 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/23/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #11 MOTION for Leave TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA ON GOOGLE, LLC PRIOR TO DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (Billick, Timothy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Akiva Cohen filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc re #11 MOTION for Leave TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA ON GOOGLE, LLC PRIOR TO DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (Billick, Timothy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA ON GOOGLE, LLC PRIOR TO DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. Noting Date 4/22/2022, (Billick, Timothy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 STRICKEN per filer's request REQUEST by Plaintiff Bungie Inc for Clerk to issue subpoena to Google LLC re #6 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter (Billick, Timothy) Modified on 4/5/2022 (SB).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dylan M Schmeyer for Plaintiff Bungie Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Akiva M Cohen for Plaintiff Bungie Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST by Plaintiff Bungie Inc for third party subpoena to Google, Inc. pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 512(h) to identify Doe defendants re #6 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter (Billick, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (RE)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate NetEase Corporation for Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Billick, Timothy)
March 28, 2022 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dylan Schmeyer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7489458 (Billick, Timothy)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Akiva M. Cohen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7489421 (Billick, Timothy)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fraudulent DMCA Notices, Lanham Act Violations, Copyright Infringement, Business Defamation, Washington Consumer Protection Act Violations, and Breach of Contract against defendant(s) John Doe 1-10 with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7489376) Attorney Timothy J Billick added to party Bungie, Inc., (pty:pla), filed by Bungie, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Billick, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bungie Inc v. Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bungie, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Timothy J Billick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bungie Inc
Represented By: Akiva M Cohen
Represented By: Dylan M Schmeyer
Represented By: Timothy J Billick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord Nazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?