Private Client Fiduciary Corporation et al v. Chopra et al
Petitioner: Joginder Chopra and Private Client Fiduciary Corporation
Respondent: Pham Singh Chopra, Akal Institute and Jane Doe Chopra
Case Number: 2:2022cv00436
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Respondent Pham Singh Chopra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/24/2022, (DeMonte, Theresa)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/23/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/7/2022, Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brent W Beecher on behalf of Respondent Akal Institute. (Beecher, Brent)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension to Answer Complaint. Pham Singh Chopra's deadline to file an answer is extended to 5/31/2022. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension to Answer Complaint, filed by Respondent Pham Singh Chopra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/13/2022, (DeMonte, Theresa)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Theresa M DeMonte on behalf of Respondent Pham Singh Chopra. (DeMonte, Theresa)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Akal Institute.(Gewald, Anthony)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony J. W. Gewald on behalf of Respondent Akal Institute. (Gewald, Anthony)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorneys Avi J. Lipman and Ai-Li Anna Chiong-Martinson added for Pham Singh Chopra; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Akal Institute, Jane Doe Chopra, Pham Singh Chopra (MW)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, For Damages by Petitioner Joginder Chopra (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spitzer, Amy)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/5/2022) (NAW).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MJV)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MJV)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Lauren King added. (MJV)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/13/2022. (MJV)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT For Damages against defendant(s) All Respondents All Plaintiffs (Receipt # AWAWDC-7501667), filed by Joginder Chopra, Private Client Fiduciary Corporation. (Spitzer, Amy) Modified on 4/6/2022 to seal document due to personal identifiers. Modified on 4/6/2022 to correct party role to Respondents. (MJV) Modified on 4/11/2022 to add additional filer (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Private Client Fiduciary Corporation et al v. Chopra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joginder Chopra
Represented By: Amy Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Private Client Fiduciary Corporation
Represented By: Amy Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pham Singh Chopra
Represented By: Ai-Li Anna Chiong-Martinson
Represented By: Avi J. Lipman
Represented By: Theresa M DeMonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Akal Institute
Represented By: Anthony J. W. Gewald
Represented By: Brent W Beecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Doe Chopra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?