Fli-Lo Falcon LLC v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp and Stelvio Transport LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc and Amazon Logistics Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00441
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Brian D Buckley. Filed by All Defendants. (Buckley, Brian)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #50 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Claire Mena for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 3, 2023 Filing 50 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Claire Mena FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7876046 (Buckley, Brian)
October 26, 2022 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (#22-35818) by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC for proceedings held on 08/22/2022 re 41 Motion Hearing,,. Requesting Attorney: Roger M Townsend.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Debbie Zurn (debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Townsend, Roger)
October 17, 2022 Filing 48 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/ USCA CASE NUMBER (22-35818) as to #47 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stelvio Transport LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Fli-Lo Falcon LLC. (RE)
October 14, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (22-35818) re #45 Order on Objections to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC. $505, receipt number AWAWDC-7740534 (cc: USCA) (Townsend, Roger) Modified on 10/18/2022 to add CCA#. (RE)
September 23, 2022 Filing 46 JUDGMENT BY COURT. Defendant's #31 Motion to Compel Arbitration is granted. Plaintiffs' complaint, and this action, are dismissed without prejudice in favor of arbitration. (SB)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting #42 Report and Recommendation. Defendant's motion to compel arbitration (dkt. #31 ) is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice in favor of arbitration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
September 22, 2022 Filing 44 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC to #42 Report and Recommendations,. Noting Date 10/7/2022, (Townsend, Roger)
September 14, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing - held via Zoom held on 8/22/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2022, (DZ)
September 8, 2022 Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Defendants' #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. This Court recommends Defendants' Motion (dkt. #31 ) be GRANTED, and that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2022, Noting Date 9/23/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment) (SB)
August 22, 2022 Filing 41 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Andrew McNeela; Def Counsel: Brian Buckley; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 1:30pm; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2022 re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon Logistics Inc. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record. Court hears argument on motion. Court takes under advisement, will issue a report and recommendation. (TF)
August 5, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc, TO RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Buckley, Brian)
July 28, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Oral Argument Hearing on Defts' #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration: Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2022 at 01:30 PM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invites. (TF)
July 15, 2022 Filing 38 Joint DECLARATION of Ali, Perez & Soto-Guajardo filed by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Townsend, Roger)
July 15, 2022 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Emilia Wiles filed by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Townsend, Roger)
July 15, 2022 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Max Whitfield filed by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Townsend, Roger)
July 15, 2022 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Flohr filed by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Townsend, Roger)
July 15, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC, to #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument Requested. (Townsend, Roger)
June 17, 2022 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Micah McCabe filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buckley, Brian)
June 17, 2022 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Brian D. Buckley filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc re #31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buckley, Brian)
June 17, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/5/2022, (Buckley, Brian)
May 25, 2022 Filing 30 STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER. Amazon's Motion to Compel Arbitration will be filed on or before 6/17/2022. Plaintiffs will file their opposition to Amazon's Motion to Compel Arbitration on or before 7/15/2022. Amazon will file its reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration on or before 8/5/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SB)
May 25, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule by parties (Buckley, Brian)
May 25, 2022 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: TBD. (Townsend, Roger)
May 24, 2022 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stelvio Transport LLC (Townsend, Roger)
May 24, 2022 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Steel City Eagles Corp (Townsend, Roger)
May 20, 2022 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Steel City Eagles Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Stelvio Transport LLC(pty:pla), filed by Fli-Lo Falcon LLC, Steel City Eagles Corp, Stelvio Transport LLC.(Townsend, Roger)
May 18, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fli-Lo Falcon LLC (Townsend, Roger)
April 25, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties stipulate that Amazon must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than 5/27/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SB)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sofia Ritala for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sofia Ritala FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7526172 (Buckley, Brian)
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Buckley, Brian)
April 21, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule by parties (Buckley, Brian)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/4/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/18/2022, Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2022. (AQ)
April 13, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Justin Stacy for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Janie Yoo Miller for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Bishop for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Justin Stacy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7511249 (Buckley, Brian)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/19/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
April 12, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Janie Yoo Miller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7511229 (Buckley, Brian)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Buckley, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew M McNeela for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Hume for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah E Flohr for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew M. McNeela FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7504027 (Townsend, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel Hume FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7504019 (Townsend, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah E. Flohr FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7504010 (Townsend, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Bishop FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Fli-Lo Falcon LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7503996 (Townsend, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JWC)
April 6, 2022 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (JWC)
April 6, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/13/2022. (JWC)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7502122) Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Fli-Lo Falcon LLC(pty:pla), filed by Fli-Lo Falcon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amazon Logistics, Inc., #3 Summons Amazon.com Inc.)(Townsend, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fli-Lo Falcon LLC v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fli-Lo Falcon LLC
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: Andrew M McNeela
Represented By: Daniel Hume
Represented By: David Bishop
Represented By: Sarah E Flohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steel City Eagles Corp
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stelvio Transport LLC
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Janie Yoo Miller
Represented By: Justin Stacy
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Claire Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc
Represented By: Janie Yoo Miller
Represented By: Justin Stacy
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Claire Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?