Rushton v. AW Chesterton Company et al
Plaintiff: Martha Rushton and Glen O Rushton
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC, Trane US Inc a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of North Carolina formerly known as American Standard Inc doing business as American Standard Products Inc., ViacomCBS Inc, A.W. Chesterton Company, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, Crane Co, General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc, Lone Star Industries Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, North Coast Electric Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company, Tate Andale Inc, Tate Temco Inc, American Standard Inc, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC, AW Chesterton Company and Does 1-350
Case Number: 2:2022cv00500
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by R Dirk Bernhardt on behalf of Defendants General Electric Company, ViacomCBS Inc. (Bernhardt, R)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Parties' #38 Stipulated MOTION To Dismiss Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.. All claims against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 16 Days. Jury Trial is set for 10/23/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/27/2023, Discovery completed by 4/26/2023, Dispositive motions due by 5/26/2023, Motions in Limine due by 9/18/2023, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 9/25/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDMENT to #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Crane Co (Shaw, G)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Phipps, Charles)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #39 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Claire E Kreider for Plaintiff Martha Rushton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #40 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Irving J Warshauer for Plaintiff Martha Rushton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Irving Warshauer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Martha Rushton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7579086 (Reeves, Kay)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Claire E. Kreider FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Martha Rushton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7579063 (Reeves, Kay)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION To Dismiss Metropolitan Life Ins. Co., filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Noting Date 6/2/2022, (Gawlowski, Richard)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Richard D Ross added for Tate Andale LLC; per #36 Notice of Attorney Association. (MW)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Tate Andale LLC.(Wood, J.)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by J. Scott Wood on behalf of Defendant Tate Andale LLC. (Wood, J.)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Zackary Paal added to party Lone Star Industries Inc(pty:dft) by Lone Star Industries Inc.(Paal, Zackary)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Howard (Terry) I. Hall added for Lone Star Industries Inc; per #35 Answer to Complaint. (MW)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE Name Change of Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. ; filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. (Uhle, Megan)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by ViacomCBS Inc.(Serko, Alice)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/24/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tate Andale LLC (Paal, Zackary)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lone Star Industries Inc (Paal, Zackary)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (Mills, Jason)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Johnson Controls International plc. for York International Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by York International Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Megan Uhle. Filed by Defendants Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. (Uhle, Megan)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zurn Water Solutions Corporation for Zurn Industries LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zurn Industries LLC (Eraut, Allen)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Uhle, Megan)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom company for Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc (Uhle, Megan)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Ricketts, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company (Craig, Kevin)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc (Craig, Kevin)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer Inc (Todaro, Anthony)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by Pfizer Inc.(Todaro, Anthony)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Gawlowski, Richard)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint; by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint; by Zurn Industries LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Serko, Alice)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc for ViacomCBS Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ViacomCBS Inc (Serko, Alice)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Sonepar USA Holdings, Inc. for North Coast Electric Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Coast Electric Company (Eraut, Allen)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; by North Coast Electric Company.(Eraut, Allen)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles E J Phipps for Plaintiff Martha Rushton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles E.J. Phipps FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Martha Rushton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7522686 (Reeves, Kay)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kay Gunderson Reeves on behalf of Plaintiff Martha Rushton. (Reeves, Kay)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records)(Serko, Alice)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission, Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) Modified on 4/22/2022. Ad Hoc: Joshua Tinajero. Notice regenerated. (ST)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court federal jury demand on file (ST) Modified on 4/22/2022. Jury demand properly filed in state court instead of federal court. (ST)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ST)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/25/2022. (ST)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Alice C. Serko re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Serko, Alice)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-00936-5-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7515636), filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Jury Demand)(Serko, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushton v. AW Chesterton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of North Carolina formerly known as American Standard Inc doing business as American Standard Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Pipe and Supply Company
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Temco Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Richard D Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Rushton
Represented By: Susan Maura Ulrich
Represented By: Charles E J Phipps
Represented By: Claire E Kreider
Represented By: Irving J Warshauer
Represented By: Kay Gunderson Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen O Rushton
Represented By: Susan Maura Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?