Maadanian v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Leonardo Cacho, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Francy Diaz Perez, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker and Betty Walton
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, Does 1-10, Mercedes-Benz Aktiengesellschaft and Mercedes-Benz Group Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 2:2022cv00665
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zachary S Bower for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
July 11, 2022 Unable to process #22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary S. Bower FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bower must complete steps for pro hac vice admission via PACER. No further action will be taken at this time. Please contact Attorney Admissions with any questions. Ad hoc Attorney Bower. (JWC)
June 30, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Anthony Todaro for Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Todaro, Anthony)
June 27, 2022 Attorneys John S Devlin, III and Taylor Washburn added for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC per #32 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
June 27, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin M Wilson on behalf of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Wilson, Erin)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott P Schlesinger for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan R Gdanski for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah J Schultz for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jordan M Steele for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Caroline F Bartlett for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey L Haberman for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James E Cecchi for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher L Ayers for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher A Seeger for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, and Betty Walton by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 17, 2022 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary S. Bower FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597742 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott P. Schlesinger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597730 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah J. Schultz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597728 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jordan M. Steele FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597725 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan R. Gdanski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597719 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Haberman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597716 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James E. Cecchi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597712 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Ayers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597707 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher A. Seeger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597693 (Emery, Timothy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caroline F. Bartlett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Leonardo Cacho, Francy Diaz Perez, Wender Jeudy, Sean K. Lee, Seyyed Javad Maadanian, Tina Marie, Rulesha McKinney, Jeffrey Robinson, Marcio Sinelli, Thomas Stefanopoulos, Jennifer Walker, Betty Walton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7597668 (Emery, Timothy)
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC on 5/18/2022, filed by Plaintiff Seyyed Javad Maadanian. (Emery, Timothy)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #9 Unopposed Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Timothy W. Emery filed by Plaintiff Seyyed Javad Maadanian re #9 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee (Emery, Timothy)
June 15, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Executive Committee, filed by Plaintiff Seyyed Javad Maadanian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy W. Emery, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/15/2022, (Emery, Timothy) Modified on 6/15/2022 to edit title (SR).
June 10, 2022 Attorneys Kim D Stephens and Rebecca Luise Solomon added for Plaintiffs, per #8 Amended Complaint. (LH)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Seyyed Javad Maadanian.(Emery, Timothy)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2022. (VE)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #5 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Amended Pleading and Related Dates. Plaintiff's amended class action complaint will be filed by 6/27/2022. Defendant's response is due within 30 days of the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Amended Pleading and Related Dates, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. Noting Date 6/6/2022, (Todaro, Anthony)
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Daimler North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Mercedes-Benz Capital Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate Mercedes-Benz Group AG for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Todaro, Anthony)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Todaro, Anthony)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (ST)
May 17, 2022 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (ST)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7554842), filed by Seyyed Javad Maadanian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Emery, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maadanian v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seyyed Javad Maadanian
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Cacho
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wender Jeudy
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean K. Lee
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rulesha McKinney
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francy Diaz Perez
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Robinson
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcio Sinelli
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stefanopoulos
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Walker
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Walton
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan R Gdanski
Represented By: Jordan M Steele
Represented By: Patrick B. Reddy
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P Schlesinger
Represented By: Timothy W Emery
Represented By: Zachary S Bower
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Erin M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Group Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?