Hepworth v. Wyze Labs Inc
Plaintiff: Bree Hepworth
Defendant: Wyze Labs Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00752
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a settlement of this case. The Court accordingly DISMISSES this case with prejudice and without court-ordered costs or attorney fees to any party. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED and any pending motion is hereby STRICKEN. If the parties are unable to perfect their settlement, they may move to reopen this case within 60 days of this order. by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
March 30, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc (Weiss, Eric)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 UPDATED STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
October 28, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Weiss, Eric)
October 11, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Bree Hepworth, to #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heidelberg, Cynthia)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #17 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines and Stay Discovery. #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss is RE-NOTED for 10/28/2022. The deadline for Ms. Hepworth's response is due by 10/10/2022. The deadline for Wyze's reply is due by 10/28/2022. The Court also VACATES initial-scheduling deadlines and STAYS discovery until resolution of Wyze's pending #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
September 13, 2022 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines and Stay Discovery, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2022, (Weiss, Eric)
August 29, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kyle Christensen filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weiss, Eric)
August 29, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/23/2022, (Weiss, Eric)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #13 Stipulated MOTION to Sequence Briefing. Wyze may file a motion to compel arbitration no later than 8/29/2022. If the action is not compelled to arbitration, Wyze may file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to Ms. Hepworth's Complaint no later than 30 days after the arbitration issue is fully resolved, including after any permissible interlocutory appeal of a denial of the motion to compel arbitration. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
August 10, 2022 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Sequence Briefing, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/10/2022, (Weiss, Eric)
July 5, 2022 Reset Deadlines. Upon joint request of the parties, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/21/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/5/2022, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2022. (NAW)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/20/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/3/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to 8/29/2022. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 22, 2022 Attorney Mallory Gitt Webster added for Wyze Labs Inc; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Weiss, Eric)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. Noting Date 6/21/2022, (Weiss, Eric)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wyze Labs Inc (Weiss, Eric)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric J Weiss on behalf of Defendant Wyze Labs Inc. (Weiss, Eric)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tyler Bean for Plaintiff Bree Hepworth by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tyler Bean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bree Hepworth (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7578955 (Heidelberg, Cynthia)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wyze Labs Inc (MJV)
June 2, 2022 Judge Lauren King added. (MJV)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) Wyze Labs Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7575386) Attorney Cynthia J Heidelberg added to party Bree Hepworth(pty:pla), filed by Bree Hepworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Heidelberg, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hepworth v. Wyze Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bree Hepworth
Represented By: Cynthia J Heidelberg
Represented By: Tyler Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyze Labs Inc
Represented By: Eric J Weiss
Represented By: Mallory Gitt Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?