Saiki v. MCG Health LLC
Plaintiff: Diana Saiki
Defendant: MCG Health, LLC and MCG Health LLC
Intervenor: Linda Booth, Mary Napier and Candace Daugherty
Case Number: 2:2022cv00849
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by parties (Dennett, Jason)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by parties (Emery, Timothy)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part Intervenors' #11 Motion to Intervene and denying Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER to Show Cause. Saiki's Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. #5 ) is denied without prejudice. All parties are hereby ORDERED to meet-and-confer in accordance with Local Civil Rule 42(b) and either file a stipulation to consolidate or file a response SHOWING CAUSE why the cases should not be consolidated (without prejudice to later bifurcation, as appropriate) on or before 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jena M Valdetero for Defendant MCG Health LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher Dodrill for Defendant MCG Health LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen Lawrence Saxl for Defendant MCG Health LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jena Valdetero FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant MCG Health LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7636988 (Allen, Jaime)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher S. Dodrill FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant MCG Health LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7636986 (Allen, Jaime)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen L. Saxl FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant MCG Health LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7636984 (Allen, Jaime)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Parties Linda Booth, Mary Napier, Candace Daugherty, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Diana Saiki(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Murray, Jennifer)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray for Linda Booth,Candace Daugherty and Mary Napier added; per #11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE (CDA)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #12 Declaration,, #11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE : Names of filers corrected to indicate Intervenors Linda Booth, Mary Napier and Candace Daugherty (CDA)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Parties' #18 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Absent the filing of a consolidated complaint, MCG shall file its Response by 9/12/2022. If a consolidated complaint is filed, MCG Health shall file its Response the later of 45 days from the filing of the consolidated complaint or 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant MCG Health LLC. Noting Date 7/13/2022, (Allen, Jaime)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Defendant MCG Health LLC. (Allen, Jaime)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case re #15 Response to Motion, ; filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki. (Dennett, Jason)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Diana Saiki, to #11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Diana Saiki(pty:pla). (Dennett, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bryan L Bleichner for Plaintiff Diana Saiki by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of JENNIFER RUST MURRAY filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki re #11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Diana Saiki(pty:pla) filed by Intervenors Linda Booth, Mary Napier and Candace Daugherty (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Murray, Jennifer) Modified on 7/15/2022 to correct filers at request of filing party (CDA).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AND HOLD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL IN ABEYANCE Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Diana Saiki(pty:pla), filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki. filed by Intervenors Linda Booth, Mary Napier and Candace Daugherty (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/15/2022, (Murray, Jennifer) Modified on 7/15/2022 to correct names of filers at request of filing party (CDA).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary M Klinger for Plaintiff Diana Saiki by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary M. Klinger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Diana Saiki (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7604301 (Dennett, Jason)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bryan Bleichner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Diana Saiki (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7604033 (Dennett, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jason T. Dennett filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Dennett, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/8/2022, (Dennett, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/8/2022, (Dennett, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MCG Health, LLC on 6/22/2022, filed by Plaintiff Diana Saiki. (Dennett, Jason)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant MCG Health LLC. (RE)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Diana Saiki (Dennett, Jason)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7596541), filed by Diana Saiki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennett, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saiki v. MCG Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Saiki
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Represented By: Bryan L Bleichner
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCG Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCG Health LLC
Represented By: Christopher Dodrill
Represented By: Jena M Valdetero
Represented By: Stephen Lawrence Saxl
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Linda Booth
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mary Napier
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Candace Daugherty
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?