Strecker v. MCG Health LLC
Plaintiff: Cynthia Strecker
Defendant: MCG Health, LLC and MCG Health LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00862
Filed: June 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases. The following actions pending in this District shall be consolidated for pre-trial proceedings and trial pursuant to FRCP 42(a): 2:22-cv-00849, 2:22-cv-00862, 2:22-cv-00870, 2:22-cv-00879, 2:22-cv-00892, 2:22-cv-00894, 2:22-cv-00925, 2:22-cv-00935, 2:22-cv-00978. The case file for the Consolidated Action will be maintained under the Master File Case No. 2:22-cv-00849. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB)
August 12, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by parties (Dennett, Jason)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. All parties are hereby ORDERED to meet-and-confer in accordance with Local Civil Rule 42(b) and either file a stipulation to consolidate or file a response SHOWING CAUSE why the cases should not be consolidated (without prejudice to later bifurcation, as appropriate) on or before 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Judge David W. Christel authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Absent the filing of a consolidated complaint, MCG shall file its Response by 9/12/2022. If a consolidated complaint is filed, MCG Health shall file its Response the later of 45 days from the filing of the consolidated complaint or 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant MCG Health LLC. Noting Date 7/14/2022, (Allen, Jaime)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Defendant MCG Health LLC. (Allen, Jaime)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/10/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2022. (LC)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph M Lyon for Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Terence R Coates for Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
July 11, 2022 Unable to process #5 #6 APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS Terence R. Coates and Joseph M. Lyon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Attorneys Coates and Lyon must complete steps for pro hac vice admission via PACER. No further action will be taken at this time. Please contact Attorney Admissions with any questions. Ad hoc Attorneys Coates and Lyon. (JWC)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above captioned case as related to C22-849-RSM-DWC to the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C22-862-RSM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph M. Lyon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7607943 (Dennett, Jason)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Terence R. Coates FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7607522 (Dennett, Jason)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MCG Health LLC (MW)
June 23, 2022 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker (Dennett, Jason)
June 21, 2022 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
June 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 22-cv-00849, by Plaintiff Cynthia Strecker. (Dennett, Jason)
June 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) MCG Health, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7598253), filed by Cynthia Strecker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennett, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/22/2022 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strecker v. MCG Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Strecker
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Joseph M Lyon
Represented By: Terence R Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCG Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCG Health LLC
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?