Angulo et al v. Providence Health & Services Washington et al
Plaintiff: Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Isabel Lindsey and Charles Lindsey
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Washington a non-profit Washington corporation doing business as Providence St. Mary Medical Center, Dr Jason Dreyer, Jane Doe Dreyer, Dr Daniel Elskens, Jane Doe Elskens, John/Jane DOES 1-10, Jason Dreyer and Daniel Elskens
Case Number: 2:2022cv00915
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Olivia Powar on behalf of Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Powar, Olivia)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PRAECIPE re #45 Declaration of RACHEL COOK by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey (Gilbert, William)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE REGARDING IMPROPER SIGNATURE. The #45 Declaration was improperly signed by Rachel Cook. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Beth M. Bollinger filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #32 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2nd Discovery Requests to Providence, #2 Exhibit B - FBI News Release, #3 Exhibit C - DOH Order re Dreyer Restrictions, #4 Exhibit D - DOH Expert Report re Dreyer)(Gilbert, William)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ERRATA re #44 Reply to Response to Motion for Remand by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey (Gilbert, William)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of RACHEL COOK filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #32 MOTION to Remand (Gilbert, William)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey, TO RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Remand (Gilbert, William)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Mary Crawford filed by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington re #32 MOTION to Remand (Payson, Kenneth)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE, by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington, to #32 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Payson, Kenneth)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, by Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer.(Galloway, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jordan C Harris for Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Harris, Jordan)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, by Daniel Elskens, Jane Doe Elskens.(Van Wert, Ronald)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, by Providence Health & Services Washington.(Payson, Kenneth)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Ryan M Beaudoin on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer. (Beaudoin, Ryan)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Jeffrey R Galloway added for Jane Doe Dreyer and Jason Dreyer; per #37 Notice of Attorney Association (LH)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ryan M Beaudoin. Filed by Defendants Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer. (Beaudoin, Ryan)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Matthew Daley for Defendants Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer. (Daley, Matthew)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Steven Joseph Dixson for Defendants Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer. (Dixson, Steven)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION of Beth M. Bollinger filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #32 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests to Providence)(Gilbert, William)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Remand) Noting Date 8/19/2022, (Gilbert, William)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Caroline Angulo, Isabel Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Qui Tam Complaint re Providence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Providence DOJ Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Providence April 12, 2022 Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Providence June 5, 2022 Union Bulletin Ad)(Gilbert, William)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer K Oetter on behalf of Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Oetter, Jennifer)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Rachel Cook filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Screenshot of DOJ Press Conference, #2 Exhibit B: Transcript of DOJ Press Conference)(Gilbert, William)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Beth M. Bollinger filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Gilbert Email of June 21, 2022, #2 Exhibit B: Chief Executive of Providence Replaced, #3 Exhibit C: 1st Discovery Requests to Providence, #4 Exhibit D: Stipulated Protective Order King County Action)(Gilbert, William)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Gilbert, William)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue (Payson, Kenneth)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Providence Health & Services, Other Affiliate Providence St. Joseph Health for Providence Health & Services Washington. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence Health & Services Washington (Payson, Kenneth)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington (Harris, Jordan)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Mary Crawford filed by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington re #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Payson, Kenneth)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Kenneth E. Payson filed by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington re #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Payson, Kenneth)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington, to #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Payson, Kenneth)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of William A. Gilbert filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: SOS Providence St. Joseph, #2 Exhibit B: Application PHSW excerpts, #3 Exhibit C: Application PHSW excerpts, #4 Exhibit D: Providence St. Joseph COVID Stimulus Watch, #5 Exhibit E: Providence St. Joseph 2022 Quarterly Report, #6 Exhibit F: Providence Code of Conduct excerpts, #7 Exhibit G: Photos of Providence Building, #8 Exhibit H: 06-21-22 Email Exchange, #9 Exhibit I: 05-25-20 NYT Article re Funds, #10 Exhibit J: 07-06-16 Article re Merger, #11 Exhibit K: Corporate Integrity Agreement with DOJ, #12 Exhibit 04-16-22 Article re Replace SMMC CEO)(Gilbert, William)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey, to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue. Oral Argument Requested. (Gilbert, William)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Payson, Kenneth)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington re #14 TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) (Payson, Kenneth)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint; by Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer.(Dixson, Steven)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Elskens on 7/8/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey. (Gilbert, William)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan M Beaudoin on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Dreyer, Jason Dreyer. (Beaudoin, Ryan)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Providence Health & Services Washington.(Payson, Kenneth)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian.. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (TF)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Beth M. Bollinger filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey re #8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Union Bulletin Article re Class Action Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B: Union Bulletin Ad by Providence, #3 Exhibit C: Correspondence re Ad, #4 Exhibit D: Response re Ad, #5 Exhibit E: Unsolicited Text Message from Providence, #6 Exhibit F: Spokesman Article re Fraud Settlement)(Gilbert, William)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order /Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiffs Caroline Angulo, Eric Keller, Charles Lindsey, Isabel Lindsey. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Protective Order/Restraining Order) Noting Date 7/22/2022, (Gilbert, William)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/8/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Cc'd attorneys Oetter, Beaudoin, and Reed. (MJV)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MJV)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MJV)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue, filed by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/22/2022, (Payson, Kenneth)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 4:21-cv-05402-TOR (ED WA); 22-2-00163-36 (Walla Walla Cnty Super. Ct);, by Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Payson, Kenneth)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence Health & Services Washington (Payson, Kenneth)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-07171-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7613211), filed by Providence Health & Services Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Complaint Operative Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payson, Kenneth) (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/5/2022 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angulo et al v. Providence Health & Services Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Angulo
Represented By: William A. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Keller
Represented By: William A. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Lindsey
Represented By: William A. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lindsey
Represented By: William A. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Washington a non-profit Washington corporation doing business as Providence St. Mary Medical Center
Represented By: Jordan C Harris
Represented By: Kenneth E Payson
Represented By: Ross Siler
Represented By: Jennifer K Oetter
Represented By: Olivia Powar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Jason Dreyer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Dreyer
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Matthew Daley
Represented By: Jeffrey R Galloway
Represented By: Ryan M Beaudoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Daniel Elskens
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Stephen Maurice Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Elskens
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Stephen Maurice Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dreyer
Represented By: Matthew Daley
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Jeffrey R Galloway
Represented By: Ryan M Beaudoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Elskens
Represented By: Ronald A Van Wert
Represented By: Stephen Maurice Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?