Cockrum et al v. C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Cockrum, Donna Cockrum and Jeffrey L Cockrum
Defendant: Howmet Aerospace Inc, C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc, Arconic Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Pfizer Inc, P-G Industries Inc, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, North Coast Electric Company, Arconic Inc and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00969
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #38 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John T Williams for Defendant/Cross Claimant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #37 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason H Nash for Defendant/Cross Claimant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #36 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Morrison for Defendant/Cross Claimant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #35 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Craig W Mandell for Defendant/Cross Claimant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 30, 2022 Filing 38 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John T. Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7684553 (Babbitt, Diane)
August 30, 2022 Filing 37 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason H. Nash FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7684545 (Babbitt, Diane)
August 30, 2022 Filing 36 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Morrison FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7684533 (Babbitt, Diane)
August 30, 2022 Filing 35 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Craig W. Mandell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7684521 (Babbitt, Diane)
August 12, 2022 Filing 34 Second DECLARATION of Mark Tuvim filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9)(Tuvim, Mark)
August 12, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Tuvim, Mark)
August 11, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pltfs' Reply - proposed order)(Olson, Justin)
August 8, 2022 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Justin Olson filed by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Olson, Justin)
August 8, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum, to #22 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pltfs' Response Proposed Order)(Olson, Justin)
August 8, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Mark B. Tuvim ISO Howmet's Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Dismissal filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Tuvim, Mark)
August 8, 2022 Filing 28 Amended RESPONSE, by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc, to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tuvim, Mark) Modified on 8/8/2022 (SR).
August 8, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc, to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Tuvim, Mark Modified on 8/8/2022 to strike entry. Amended Response filed at dkt. #28 (SR).
July 28, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by North Coast Electric Company.(Eraut, Allen)
July 21, 2022 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to VACATE the deadlines contained in the #13 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT pending the Court's ruling on #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum and #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc. (VE)
July 20, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Howmet Aerospace Inc (Tuvim, Mark)
July 20, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Gawlowski, Richard)
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Mark B. Tuvim filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Tuvim, Mark)
July 19, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Tuvim, Mark)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sonepar USA Holdings, Inc. for North Coast Electric Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Coast Electric Company (Eraut, Allen)
July 18, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc (Leeper, Virginia)
July 18, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(Babbitt, Diane)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fisher Scientific International L.L.C for Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Babbitt, Diane)
July 18, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin Olson filed by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Olson, Justin)
July 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice, filed by Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L Cockrum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Olson, Justin)
July 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Virginia Leeper. Filed by Defendant C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc. (Leeper, Virginia)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)cc via ad hoc Attorneys DeSipio and Barrett
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/28/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/4/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer Inc (Todaro, Anthony)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; by Pfizer Inc.(Todaro, Anthony)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP) Modified on 7/14/2022 to strike entry (SR).
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (SP)
July 14, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #9 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter: Per phone call with the office of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, jury demand was never requested on any documents from entry #1 . The deficiency is stricken, no further action is needed. (SR)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L. Cockrum. (Bergman, Matthew)
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiffs Donna Cockrum, Jeffrey L. Cockrum. (Olson, Justin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Defendant Howmet Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36 - Segment 1, #37 Exhibit 36 - Segment 2, #38 Exhibit 36 - Segment 3, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62, #65 Exhibit 63, #66 Exhibit 64, #67 Exhibit 65, #68 Exhibit 66, #69 Exhibit 67)(Tuvim, Mark)
July 13, 2022 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
July 13, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:22-cv-05500 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 2:22-00969-TLF. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SP)
July 13, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/20/2022. (SP)
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION ISO Notice of Removal of Mark B. Tuvim re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Howmet Aerospace, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Tuvim, Mark)
July 11, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION ISO Notice of Removal of Mark B. Tuvim by Defendant Howmet Aerospace, Inc. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-08602-5; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7624895), filed by Howmet Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tuvim, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2022: #2 State Court Complaint) (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockrum et al v. C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmet Aerospace Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arconic Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-G Industries Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc
Represented By: Craig W Mandell
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Represented By: Jason H Nash
Represented By: John T Williams
Represented By: Michael J Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arconic Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Cockrum
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cockrum
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Cockrum
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?