Mohamed et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anisa Mohamed and Sahra Mohamed
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01034
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Parties' #18 Stipulated Motion to Stay and Denying Parties' #19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Answer Deadline as Moot. The Court ORDERS all proceedings in this action stayed until entry of the Ninth Circuit's mandate in Jama et al. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al., Case No. #22-35449. The Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report and proposed Case Schedule to the Court within thirty (30) days of the aforementioned mandate. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
August 15, 2022 Filing 19 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/15/2022, (Wakefield, Scott)
August 15, 2022 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by Plaintiffs Anisa Mohamed, Sahra Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/15/2022, (Trivett, Mark)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re #5 Verification of State Court Records by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott) Modified to add linkage on 8/11/2022 (LH).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter W Herzog, III for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric L Robertson for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Parties' #7 Joint Stipulated MOTION. Defendant's response to the Complaint is now due by 8/17/2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/26/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/9/2022, Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2022. (KMP)
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter W. Herzog, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7647168 (Wakefield, Scott)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric L. Robertson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7647159 (Wakefield, Scott)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 Joint Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/28/2022, (Wakefield, Scott)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (JWC)
July 28, 2022 Judge Tana Lin added. (JWC)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-454-MJP, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wakefield, Scott)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-09407-9-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7640944) Attorney Scott Channing Wakefield added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wakefield, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anisa Mohamed
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Represented By: Mark A Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahra Mohamed
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Mark A Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Scott Channing Wakefield
Represented By: Eric L Robertson
Represented By: Peter W Herzog, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?