Arrow Reliance Inc v. Woodcock et al
Plaintiff: Arrow Reliance Inc doing business as Darwin's Natural Pet Products
Defendant: Janet Woodcock, United States Food and Drug Administration and Robert Califf
Case Number: 2:2022cv01057
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Food and Drug Administration, Robert Califf, filed by Arrow Reliance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rainwater, Lauren)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Parties' #16 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/27/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/4/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc. Noting Date 8/26/2022, (Rainwater, Lauren)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rainwater, Lauren)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Grant Cogswell; Pla Counsel: Lauren Rainwater, Nick Kampars; Def Counsel: Noah Katzen, James Allred; CR: Nickie Drury; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM; Courtroom: Zoom;TRO Hearing held on 8/2/2022. The Court hears oral argument on Dkt. No. #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. After hearing arguments, the Court takes this matter under advisement and will issue a written order by close of business on August 4, 2022. (GC)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nick Kampars for Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Defendants United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Noah T. Katzen)(Katzen, Noah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Oliver McDonald on behalf of Defendants United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock. (McDonald, Oliver)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Intent to File Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Defendants United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock. (Katzen, Noah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Noah T Katzen on behalf of Defendants United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock. (Katzen, Noah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, filed by Arrow Reliance Inc.(Rainwater, Lauren)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: TRO Hearing set for 8/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nick Kampars FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7647220 (Rainwater, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of GARY TASHJIAN filed by Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rainwater, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Arrow Reliance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/2/2022, (Rainwater, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Arrow Reliance Inc (Rainwater, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) United States Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock (Receipt # AWAWDC-7647188), filed by Arrow Reliance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Janet Woodcock, #3 Summons US FDA)(Rainwater, Lauren)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Reliance Inc v. Woodcock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Reliance Inc doing business as Darwin's Natural Pet Products
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Nick Kampars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Woodcock
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Califf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?