Amazon.com Inc et al v. Autospeedstore et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC and King Technology Inc
Defendant: Autospeedstore, BaoluNikaz, CSY Cartridges, Elite Quality Ever, Emmanuel Lewis, Ethan Holloway Shops Staff, Fdgdgdssa, Gainford Shop, High Quality Optimization, Highest Quality Boutiques Store, Hot Spring Memorial House, Jertyhujeky, Max Shepherd Shop, Minyao Electronics, SPAFROG-XABAV, Prioritizequalitier, Serve Enjoy Pool, Sheng Ye LLC, Tub Gospel, Whitener Top Store, Wood Wine Market, XABAV SPA, Old Lady Staff (Ritchie), Autospeedstore doing business as an Amazon selling account, BaoluNikaz doing business as an Amazon selling account, CSY Cartridges doing business as an Amazon selling account, Elite Quality Ever doing business as an Amazon selling account, Emmanuel Lewis doing business as an Amazon selling account, Ethan Holloway Shops Staff doing business as an Amazon selling account, Fdgdgdssa doing business as an Amazon selling account, Gainford Shop doing business as an Amazon selling account, High Quality Optimization doing business as an Amazon selling account, Highest Quality Boutiques Store doing business as an Amazon selling account, Hot Spring Memorial House doing business as an Amazon selling account, Jertyhujeky doing business as an Amazon selling account, Max Shepherd Shop doing business as an Amazon selling account, Minyao Electronics doing business as an Amazon selling account, SPAFROG-XABAV doing business as an Amazon selling account, Prioritizequalitier doing business as an Amazon selling account, Serve Enjoy Pool doing business as an Amazon selling account, Sheng Ye LLC doing business as an Amazon selling account, Tub Gospel doing business as an Amazon selling account, Whitener Top Store doing business as an Amazon selling account, Wood Wine Market doing business as an Amazon selling account, XABAV SPA doing business as an Amazon selling account, Old Lady Staff (Ritchie) doing business as an Amazon selling account, Does 1-10 doing business as an Amazon selling account, Melissa Grace Coaching LLC and Chase Everett Godwn doing business as an Amazon Selling Account
Case Number: 2:2022cv01183
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Consolidate. On 8/25/2022 Plaintiffs filed three separate lawsuits alleging what they assert to be "identical causes of action based on similar fact patterns" against different groups of defendants. The other cases are C22-1184 MJP and C22-1186 MJP. Although Plaintiffs chose to file these lawsuits separately, they now ask the Court to consolidate them for all further proceedings. The Court ORDERS these three cases be consolidated. All papers filed in this consolidated action must be filed under Case No. C22-1183 MJP, the number assigned to the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, King Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/6/2022, (Commerson, Scott)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/31/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/7/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-01184 and 2:22-cv-01186, by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, King Technology Inc. (Commerson, Scott)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MJV)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Autospeedstore, BaoluNikaz, CSY Cartridges, Elite Quality Ever, Ethan Holloway Shops Staff, Fdgdgdssa, Gainford Shop, High Quality Optimization, Highest Quality Boutiques Store, Hot Spring Memorial House, Jertyhujeky, Emmanuel Lewis, Max Shepherd Shop, Minyao Electronics, Old Lady Staff (Ritchie), Prioritizequalitier, SPAFROG-XABAV, Serve Enjoy Pool, Sheng Ye LLC, Tub Gospel, Whitener Top Store, Wood Wine Market, XABAV SPA (MJV)
August 26, 2022 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (MJV)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by King Technology, Inc. (Rainwater, Lauren)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC (Rainwater, Lauren)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7678246), filed by Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, King Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #6 Summons Autospeedstore, #7 Summons BaoluNikaz, #8 Summons CSY Cartridges, #9 Summons Elite Quality Ever, #10 Summons Emmanuel Lewis, #11 Summons Ethan Holloway Shops Staff, #12 Summons Fdgdgdssa, #13 Summons Gainford Shop, #14 Summons High Quality Optimization, #15 Summons Highest Quality Boutiques Store, #16 Summons Hot Spring Memorial House, #17 Summons Jertyhujeky, #18 Summons Max Shepherd Shop, #19 Summons Minyao Electronics, #20 Summons Old Lady Staff (Ritchie), #21 Summons Prioritizequalitier, #22 Summons Serve Enjoy Pool, #23 Summons Sheng Ye LLC, #24 Summons SPAFROG-XABAV, #25 Summons Tub Gospel, #26 Summons Whitener Top Store, #27 Summons Wood Wine Market, #28 Summons XABAV SPA)(Rainwater, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc et al v. Autospeedstore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Technology Inc
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autospeedstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BaoluNikaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSY Cartridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Quality Ever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Holloway Shops Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fdgdgdssa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gainford Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Quality Optimization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highest Quality Boutiques Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Spring Memorial House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jertyhujeky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Shepherd Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minyao Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPAFROG-XABAV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prioritizequalitier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serve Enjoy Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheng Ye LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tub Gospel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitener Top Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Wine Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XABAV SPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Lady Staff (Ritchie)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autospeedstore doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BaoluNikaz doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSY Cartridges doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Quality Ever doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Lewis doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Holloway Shops Staff doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fdgdgdssa doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gainford Shop doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Quality Optimization doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highest Quality Boutiques Store doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Spring Memorial House doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jertyhujeky doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Shepherd Shop doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minyao Electronics doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPAFROG-XABAV doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prioritizequalitier doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serve Enjoy Pool doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheng Ye LLC doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tub Gospel doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitener Top Store doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Wine Market doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XABAV SPA doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Lady Staff (Ritchie) doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 doing business as an Amazon selling account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Grace Coaching LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Everett Godwn doing business as an Amazon Selling Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?