Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Railworks Track Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust and Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Defendant: Railworks Track Systems Inc and Railworks Track Systems Inc a foreign corporation, Contractor's License No. RAILWTS996BR, UBI No. 601206904 doing business as Railworks Track Systems LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01236
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is hereby ordered and adjudged that Defendant Railworks Track Systems LLC is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees to any parties. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (SB)
June 14, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal by parties (Dwarzski, Noelle)
May 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Dwarzski, Noelle)
April 4, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Jamal N. Whitehead. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (VE)
January 31, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Noelle E Dwarzski for Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust from March 1 - 31, 2023. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 4 days. Bench Trial is set for 4/1/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/4/2023, Discovery completed by 12/3/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/17/2023, Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2024, Motions in Limine due by 3/4/2024, Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2024, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/27/2024. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (VE)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER to Counsel re the #18 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. The stipulated protective order received by the Court will remain lodged in the file, but will not be entered. The parties may resubmit a proposed order if they remedy the identified deficiencies. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
November 16, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
November 16, 2022 Filing 17 PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust (Attachments: #1 Page 1 Complaint, #2 Def Counsel Email Request)(Dwarzski, Noelle)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent RailWorks Partners, LP for Railworks Track Systems Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Railworks Track Systems Inc (Crowner, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Railworks Track Systems Inc.(Crowner, Daniel)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2022. (VE)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION. Defendant's Answeris now due by October 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
September 26, 2022 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File and Serve Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. Noting Date 9/26/2022, (Crowner, Daniel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2022. (VE)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The following Orders are hereby VACATED: #3 Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report. (VE)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER entered at the direction of Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. The #7 Order Regarding FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report is VACATED. (VE)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David M Pixley for Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/5/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2022, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 21, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (JWC)
September 20, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David M. Pixley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7709366 (Crowner, Daniel)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P Crowner on behalf of Defendant Railworks Track Systems Inc. (Crowner, Daniel)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (JWC)
September 2, 2022 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (JWC)
September 2, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/9/2022. (CDA)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Railworks Track Systems Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7688255) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust(pty:pla), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Railworks Track Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railworks Track Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railworks Track Systems Inc a foreign corporation, Contractor's License No. RAILWTS996BR, UBI No. 601206904 doing business as Railworks Track Systems LLC
Represented By: David M Pixley
Represented By: Daniel P Crowner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?