Datta et al v. Jaddou et al
Plaintiff: Sidhartha Datta, Milly Sharma, Nagi Jonnala, Swarna Guntaka, Srinivasulu Madarapu, Anuradha Madarapu, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty and Poorani Dharmasivam
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou and Antony Blinken
Case Number: 2:2022cv01302
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 USCA CASE NUMBER (22-35773) for #11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Srinivasulu Madarapu, Swarna Guntaka, Sidhartha Datta, Poorani Dharmasivam, Nagi Jonnala, Anuradha Madarapu, Milly Sharma, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. Circuit Rule 3-3. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order. (RE)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4) (SB)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (22-35773) re #10 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Sidhartha Datta, Poorani Dharmasivam, Swarna Guntaka, Nagi Jonnala, Anuradha Madarapu, Srinivasulu Madarapu, Milly Sharma, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty. $505, receipt number AWAWDC-7723664 (cc: USCA) (Banias, Brad) Modified on 10/4/2022 to add CCA#. (RE)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
September 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Defendants Antony Blinken, Ur M Jaddou, to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Lambert, Michelle)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants Antony Blinken, Ur M Jaddou. (Lambert, Michelle)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Antony Blinken, Ur M Jaddou. (Lambert, Michelle)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE re Notice to Filer, Additional Parties by Plaintiffs Sidhartha Datta, Poorani Dharmasivam, Swarna Guntaka, Nagi Jonnala, Anuradha Madarapu, Srinivasulu Madarapu, Milly Sharma, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty (Banias, Brad)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs Sidhartha Datta, Poorani Dharmasivam, Swarna Guntaka, Nagi Jonnala, Anuradha Madarapu, Srinivasulu Madarapu, Milly Sharma, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/15/2022, (Banias, Brad)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brad Banias for All Plaintiffs by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Due to the amount of Plaintiffs, most of them are not listed on the docket itself - see #1 Complaint for full list. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) NEF regenerated 9/14/2022 to Plaintiffs' local counsel, Kripa Upadhyay, at her correct e-mail address (kripa@karrtuttle.com) (JWC).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad hoc: Kripa Upadhyay @ email address on complaint) (ST)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brad Banias FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs AD, Sidhartha Datta, Poorani Dharmasivam, Swarna Guntaka, Nagi Jonnala, Anuradha Madarapu, Srinivasulu Madarapu, SSP, Milly Sharma, VACM, VSJ, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7702227 (Upadhyay, Kripa)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Antony Blinken, Ur M Jaddou (Receipt # AWAWDC-7702196) Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party AD(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sidhartha Datta(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Poorani Dharmasivam(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Swarna Guntaka(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Nagi Jonnala(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Anuradha Madarapu(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Srinivasulu Madarapu(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party SSP(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Milly Sharma(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party VACM(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party VSJ(pty:pla), Attorney Kripa Upadhyay added to party Sathya Prakash Veerichetty(pty:pla), filed by VSJ, Poorani Dharmasivam, AD, Srinivasulu Madarapu, VACM, SSP, Milly Sharma, Anuradha Madarapu, Nagi Jonnala, Sidhartha Datta, Sathya Prakash Veerichetty, Swarna Guntaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Receipts and Information, #2 Exhibit B: DOS Memo, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Upadhyay, Kripa)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Due to the volumnious number of plaintiffs' that could not be entered upon case opening, please file a list of all plaintiffs' by going to Other Documents and select Praecipe-Other. The title of the document should be entered as "Additional Parties." (Ad hoc: Kripa Upadhyay) (ST)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge John H. Chun added. (Law firm, address, phone number and email address for plaintiff's counsel does not match information in ECF. Plaintiff's counsel ad hoc'd on this entry at email address on complaint. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datta et al v. Jaddou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidhartha Datta
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milly Sharma
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagi Jonnala
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swarna Guntaka
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Represented By: Brad Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Srinivasulu Madarapu
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuradha Madarapu
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sathya Prakash Veerichetty
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poorani Dharmasivam
Represented By: Brad Banias
Represented By: Kripa Upadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?