Yates v. Northwest Barricade & Signs
Plaintiff: Emily Yates
Defendant: Northwest Barricade & Signs and Northwest Flagging
Case Number: 2:2022cv01518
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Rathbone, Mary)
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (SB)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #5 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emily Yates (Rathbone, Mary)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Emily Yates.(Rathbone, Mary)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/1/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/15/2022. (AD)
November 14, 2022 Attorneys Matthew J Macario, Jeremy F. Wood added for Northwest Barricade & Signs per the filing of Defendant's #3 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Suzanne Kelly Michael on behalf of Defendant Northwest Barricade & Signs. (Michael, Suzanne)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Northwest Barricade & Signs (JWC)
October 26, 2022 Judge John H. Chun added. (JWC)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Northwest Barricade & Signs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7752725), filed by Emily Yates. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Northwest Barricade & Signs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rathbone, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Northwest Barricade & Signs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Yates
Represented By: Mary Moberg Rathbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Barricade & Signs
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Jeremy F. Wood
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Flagging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?