Aperture Net LLC v. Electric Mirror Inc
Plaintiff: Aperture Net LLC
Defendant: Electric Mirror Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv01548
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy J Maier for Defendant Electric Mirror Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/9/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2023, Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2023. (KMP)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Siddhesh V Pandit for Defendant Electric Mirror Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 8, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy J. Maier FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Electric Mirror Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7806206 (Turner, Duncan)
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Siddhesh V. Pandit FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Electric Mirror Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7806202 (Turner, Duncan)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's response to the Complaint is now due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Judge Tana Lin.(LH)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/14/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (SNP)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION and (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Electric Mirror Inc. Noting Date 12/6/2022, (Turner, Duncan)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Duncan Calvert Turner on behalf of Defendant Electric Mirror Inc. (Turner, Duncan)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (JWC)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Electric Mirror Inc (JWC)
November 2, 2022 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (JWC)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aperture Net LLC (Mann, Philip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Electric Mirror Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7762449) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Aperture Net LLC(pty:pla), filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #4 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aperture Net LLC v. Electric Mirror Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aperture Net LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Mirror Inc
Represented By: Timothy J Maier
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Siddhesh V Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?