Guy v. Convergent Outsourcing Inc
Plaintiff: Leo Guy, Ryan Tanner, Magaly Granados and Kerry Lamons
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. and Convergent Outsourcing Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Tammy Rano, Vicki Will, Juan Garcia-Meza and Jennifer Marie White
Case Number: 2:2022cv01558
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Cameron R. Azari filed by All Plaintiffs re #55 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement (Jordan, Cecily)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Gary M. Klinger filed by All Plaintiffs re #55 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Complaint B)(Jordan, Cecily)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2023, (Jordan, Cecily)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #53 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to file Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is hereby extended until 10/30/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Magaly Granados, Kerry Lamons, Tammy Rano, Ryan Tanner, Jennifer Marie White, Vicki Will, Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/12/2023, (Mason, Gary)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #51 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Plaintiffs' deadline is hereby extended by fourteen (14) days until 10/16/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement , filed by Consol Plaintiffs Juan Garcia-Meza, Magaly Granados, Kerry Lamons, Tammy Rano, Ryan Tanner, Jennifer Marie White, Vicki Will, Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/25/2023, (Jordan, Cecily)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Parties' #49 Stipulated Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SS)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Preliminary Approval, filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 8/17/2023, (Jordan, Cecily)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Parties' #47 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #31 Amended Complaint. Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Leo Guy, et al.'s (together, "Plaintiffs") Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint is extended up to and including 9/26/2023, or, if Plaintiffs file their Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint on or before 9/5/2023, thirty (30) days after its filing. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #31 Amended Complaint,, , filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/1/2023, (Morrison, James)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/24/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #36 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the Motion in part and DISMISSES Plaintiffs' negligence, breach of implied contract, breach of the duty of confidence, Washington Data Breach Law, CCPA (in part) and California constitutional privacy claims. The Court DENIES the Motion as to Plaintiffs' invasion of privacy, unjust enrichment, Washington CPA, CCPA (in part), UCL, and declaratory relief claims. The Court DISMISSES all but the CCPA claim with prejudice. If Plaintiffs wish to file an amended complaint, they must do so within 45 days of this Order. The Court will separately issue an order requiring a joint status report in the interim. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY, filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc, TO RESPONSE to #36 MOTION to Dismiss (Morrison, James)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Consol Plaintiffs Juan Garcia-Meza, Magaly Granados, Kerry Lamons, Tammy Rano, Ryan Tanner, Jennifer Marie White, Vicki Will, Plaintiff Leo Guy, to #36 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jordan, Cecily)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Gary E Mason. Filed by Consol Plaintiffs Juan Garcia-Meza, Magaly Granados, Kerry Lamons, Tammy Rano, Ryan Tanner, Jennifer Marie White, Vicki Will, Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Mason, Gary)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Danielle L Perry. Filed by Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Perry, Danielle)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Lisa A White. Filed by Plaintiff Leo Guy. (White, Lisa)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Parties' #38 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss must be filed on or before 4/12/2023 and Defendant's reply to the motion to dismiss must be filed by 4/26/2023. The motion to dismiss is re-noted on the motion calendar to 4/26/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/23/2023, (Morrison, James)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *7-10 Days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/23/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 3/21/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/30/2023, Motions due by 3/27/2024, Discovery completed by 4/26/2024, Dispositive motions due by 5/28/2024, Motions in Limine due by 8/19/2024, Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2024, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/10/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/10/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Deadline to file class certification motion shall be due 10/30/2023, Deadline by which Plaintiff's must make class cert experts available for deposition is 11/30/2023, Deadline to file opposition to class certification motion and disclose expert and report pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) in opposition to class certification motion shall by due 1/15/2024, Deadline by which COI must make class cert experts available for deposition is 2/15/2024, Deadline to file reply in support of class certification motion; no rebuttal report absent court permission is 3/15/2024. The Court does not require mediation or settlement dates though they may be done at any time. The Court will not alter dates or grant continuances to accommodate the parties scheduling of these activities. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (GC)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2023, (Morrison, James)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-10. (Jordan, Cecily)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa Bilancini for Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa Bilancini FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7888433 (Morrison, James)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason M Wucetich for Plaintiff Jennifer Marie White by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CONSOLIDATED) against defendant(s) Convergent Outsourcing Inc with JURY DEMAND Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Magaly Granados(pty:conpla), Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Leo Guy(pty:pla), Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Tammy Rano(pty:conpla), Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Ryan Tanner(pty:conpla), Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Jennifer Marie White(pty:conpla), Attorney Cecily Jordan added to party Vicki Will(pty:conpla), filed by Tammy Rano, Kerry Lamons, Jennifer Marie White, Magaly Granados, Leo Guy, Ryan Tanner, Vicki Will. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jordan, Cecily)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason M. Wucetich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Consol Plaintiff Jennifer Marie White (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7885610 (Jordan, Cecily)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER of Consolidation. The Court ORDERS that the matter of White v. Convergent Outsourcing Inc et al, C23-182-MJP, be consolidated for all purposes with this matter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Parties' #27 Joint Motion to Consolidate. Garcia-Meza v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (No. 2:22-cv-01804-BJR) shall be consolidated with Guy v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (No. 2:22-cv-01558-MJP). All case deadlines in the Garcia-Meza Action are stricken and all case deadlines in the Guy Action shall apply to the Garcia-Meza Action, including the Guy Action Order Granting Stipulated Motion To Extend Complaint Response Deadline (Dkt. #15 ) and the Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement (Dkt. #26 ). Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Guy Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Garcia-Meza Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/26/2023, (Morrison, James)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 3/10/2023. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Marsha J Pechman. (GC)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Consolidate. The Court ORDERS that the matter of Will v. Convergent Outsourcing Inc., C22-1813 MJP, be consolidated for all purposes with this matter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Plaintiffs have now identified Jean Martin as the Co-Lead whip and Cecily C. Jordan as the local liaison counsel. (See Dkt. No. #22 .) The Court approves of these selections. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Consolidation. The Court ORDERS that the matter C22-1652 MJP be consolidated for all purposes with this consolidated matter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
December 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Magaly Granados, Leo Guy, Ryan Tanner (Mason, Gary)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/19/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/26/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. The court APPOINTS as interim co-lead counsel: (1) Gary E. Mason of Mason LLP; (2) Jean S. Martin of Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group; and (3) Gary M. Klinger of Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Grant Cogswell; Pla Counsel: Gary Mason, Michael Subit, Jean Martin, Beth Terrell, Gary Klinger, Jason Dennett, Philip Krzeski; Def Counsel: James Morrison, Bethany Lukitsch; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM; Courtroom: Zoom;Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2022. THe Court hears Oral Argument on the MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel Dkt. No. #10 . The Court will issue a written order with the rulings made on the record following this entry.(GC)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bethany G Lukitsch for Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bethany G. Lukitsch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7818550 (Morrison, James)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearing on #10 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. This hearing will be conducted remotely using Zoom.(GC)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (filed in 22-cv-1562, ECF #9). The Court ADMITS Attorney Jean Sutton Martin for Plaintiff Ryan Tanner by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Consolidate. All filings in this consolidated action shall be filed on the docket of the first-filed case (C22-1558). The Clerk is directed to file this Order in all four cases and then administratively close the following related cases: (1) C22-1562 MJP; (2) C22-1590 MJP; and (3) C22-1597 MJP. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Parties' #14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint is extended until the greater of either 1/12/2023, or, if the pending Motion to Consolidate is granted, thirty (30) days after the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/23/2022, (Morrison, James) Modified title on 11/23/2022 (SS).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Convergent Resources, Inc. for Convergent Outsourcing Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Convergent Outsourcing Inc (Morrison, James)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Raymond Morrison on behalf of Defendant Convergent Outsourcing Inc. (Morrison, James)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. on 11/7/2022, filed by Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Mason, Gary)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3), filed by Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Mason LLP Resume, #2 Exhibit B M&M Resume, #3 Exhibit C Milberg Resume, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/25/2022, (Mason, Gary)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support, filed by Plaintiff Leo Guy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/25/2022, (Mason, Gary)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lisa A. White FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lisa A White for Plaintiff Leo Guy by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Danielle L Perry for Plaintiff Leo Guy by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lisa A. White FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Leo Guy. Receipt No. AWAWDC-7766035 (Subit, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary E Mason for Plaintiff Leo Guy by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Danielle L. Perry FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo Guy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7766050 (Subit, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary E. Mason FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo Guy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7766046 (Subit, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Convergent Outsourcing Inc (JWC)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (JWC)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7764221), filed by Leo Guy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Subit, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Convergent Outsourcing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Guy
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Represented By: Danielle L Perry
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Tanner
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Ryan Tack-Hooper
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly Granados
Represented By: Philip J Krzeski
Represented By: Bryan L Bleichner
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Lamons
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing Inc
Represented By: Bethany G Lukitsch
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: Melissa Bilancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tammy Rano
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vicki Will
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Juan Garcia-Meza
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jennifer Marie White
Represented By: Dimitrios Vasiliou Korovilas
Represented By: Jason M Wucetich
Represented By: Cecily Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?