Conlisk et al v. Zillow Group Inc
Plaintiff: Mark Conlisk and Michael Dekhtyar
Defendant: Zillow Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv01698
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate. The following actions are hereby consolidated into Civil Action No. 2:22-cv-01282 for pretrial purposes only: Perkins et al v. Zillow Group, Inc. et al, No. 2:22-cv-01282; Conlisk et al v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01698; Huber v. Zillow Group Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01699; Kauffman v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01694; Popa v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01696; Strelzin v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01695; Adams et al v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01737; and Margulis v. Zillow Group, Inc., No. 2:22-cv-01736. The consolidated action shall be captioned: "In Re: Zillow Group, Inc. Session Replay Software Litigation." The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-01282 shall constitute a Master File for every action in the consolidated action. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report by January 27, 2023, informing the court as to when the parties intend to move for consolidation of Zillow class actions and appointment of interim class counsel. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
December 9, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zillow Group Inc (Savitt, James)
December 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James P Savitt on behalf of Defendant Zillow Group Inc. (Savitt, James)
December 8, 2022 CASE REASSIGNED to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge John C. Coughenour is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number 2:22-CV-1698-JLR. (KMP)
December 6, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Zillow Group Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/13/2022. (KB)
November 30, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Northern District of Illinois, Chicago and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
November 30, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from Northern District of Illinois, (Chicago) Case Number 1:22-cv-05082-JFK.
November 30, 2022 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Washington the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: For the reasons stated in the motion, the parties' joint motion to transfer #12 is granted. Accordingly, this case is transferred forthwith, to the U.S. District Court, Western District of Washington. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. to transfer case [Joint Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)] (Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN: Before the Panel is a motion by defendant Zillow Group, Inc. filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. In its motion, defendant seeks centralization of the actions on the attached schedule in the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Movant now seeks to withdraw his Section 1407 motion. No responding party has opposed the withdrawal. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendant's motion for transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Defendant's Agreed Motion to stay #9 is granted. Case stayed until further order of Court. The status report deadline and initial status hearing are stricken. If needed, a new status date will be set by separate order. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. to stay Agreed Motion to Stay the Action Pending Likely Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Zillow Group, Inc. (Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to transfer actions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings by Zillow Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zillow Group, Inc's brief in support of motion to transfer actions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (jn, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Conlisk, Michael Dekhtyar as to Zillow Group, Inc. on 9/21/2022, answer due 10/12/2022. (Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Zillow Group, Inc. of Filing Motion to Transfer Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Motion to Transfer)(Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer #3 is granted. Defendant must answer on otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 12/12/2022. Status hearing set for 12/21/2022 at 09:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than seven days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. for extension of time to file answer move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. by David T Cellitti (Cellitti, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by Mark Conlisk, Michael Dekhtyar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19853896. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klinger, Gary) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
September 19, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
September 19, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. (jk2, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]
September 19, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/30/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conlisk et al v. Zillow Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Conlisk
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dekhtyar
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Group Inc
Represented By: David T Cellitti
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: James P Savitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?