McIntire v. Housing Authority of Snohomish County
Plaintiff: Shawna McIntire
Defendant: Housing Authority of Snohomish County
Case Number: 2:2022cv01757
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Jury Trial is set for 3/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/27/2023, Motions due by 10/10/2023, Discovery completed by 11/13/2023, Dispositive motions due by 12/11/2023, Motions in Limine due by 2/19/2024, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/30/2023, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/4/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2024 before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(TF)
January 31, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. Filed by Plaintiff Shawna McIntire.(Crain, Scott)
January 31, 2023 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Housing Authority of Snohomish County (Repass, Timothy)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Housing Authority of Snohomish County.(Repass, Timothy)
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ashley Lynn Blackburn on behalf of Defendant Housing Authority of Snohomish County. (Blackburn, Ashley)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Housing Authority of Snohomish County (Blackburn, Ashley)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/24/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2023, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/29/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy John Repass on behalf of Defendant Housing Authority of Snohomish County. (Repass, Timothy)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Housing Authority of Snohomish County (JWC)
December 15, 2022 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (JWC)
December 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Housing Authority of Snohomish County (Receipt # AWAWDC-7810871), filed by Shawna McIntire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crain, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntire v. Housing Authority of Snohomish County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna McIntire
Represented By: Constance M Van Winkle
Represented By: Tyler Graber
Represented By: Scott Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of Snohomish County
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Blackburn
Represented By: Timothy John Repass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?