Adams v. City of Seattle
Plaintiff: Anita Adams
Defendant: City of Seattle, Washington and City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2022cv01767
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by City of Seattle.(Weber, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2023 Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, docket no. #9 , the deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to January 13, 2023. (KK)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Answer, filed by Defendant City of Seattle. Noting Date 1/6/2023, (Weber, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 PRAECIPE to attach document re #7 Notice of Appearance by Defendant City of Seattle (Weber, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2022 Attorney Roger Douglas Wynne added for City of Seattle; per #8 Praecipe to #7 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey S Weber on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Weber, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on City of Seattle on 12/19/2022, filed by Plaintiff Anita Adams. (Maurer, William)
December 20, 2022 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #7 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed (missing signature) by Roger Wynne. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SR) (cc: Attorney Wynne via ad hoc)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/3/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/17/2023. (KK)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle Washington (JWC)
December 16, 2022 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (JWC)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Suranjan Sen for Plaintiff Anita Adams by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Suranjan Sen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Anita Adams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7813248 (Maurer, William)
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) City of Seattle, Washington (Receipt # AWAWDC-7813110) Attorney William Randolph Maurer added to party Anita Adams(pty:pla), filed by Anita Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for City of Seattle)(Maurer, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Adams
Represented By: William Randolph Maurer
Represented By: Suranjan Sen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Jeffrey S Weber
Represented By: Roger Douglas Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?