De Botton v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Raymond De Botton
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Warren Lance, First Horizon Loan Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., State of Washington, McCarthy & Holthus LLP and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00223
Filed: February 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, to #24 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro.56(d). (McIntosh, Joseph)
April 17, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #17 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. Noting Date 5/19/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph)
April 17, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #19 Response to Motion, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Sagara, Midori)
April 13, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro.56(d), filed by Plaintiff Raymond De Botton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stafne, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/21/2023, (Stafne, Scott)
April 3, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #18 MOTION to Remand . Filed by Plaintiff Raymond De Botton. Noting Date 4/21/2023, (Stafne, Scott)
March 30, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #17 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. Noting Date 4/21/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #14 , #20 Motions for Extension of Time. The FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is now 4/7/2023, the Initial Disclosure Deadline is now 4/14/2023, and the Joint Status Report is now due by 4/21/2023. The moving parties will renote the pending #17 Second Amended Motion for Summary Judgment and #18 Motion to Remand for consideration on or after 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
March 22, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Raymond De Botton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Stafne, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2023, (Stafne, Scott)
March 18, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, to #18 MOTION to Remand . (McIntosh, Joseph)
March 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Raymond De Botton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stafne, #2 Declaration of de Botton, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/21/2023 4/7/2023, (Stafne, Scott) Modified noting date on 4/5/2023 (LH).
March 16, 2023 Filing 17 Second Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/21/2023 4/7/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph) Modified title on 3/23/2023 (LH). Modified noting date on 3/31/2023 (LH).
March 16, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #13 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (McIntosh, Joseph)
March 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #13 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. Noting Date 3/31/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph)
March 9, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Raymond De Botton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Stafne, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/17/2023, (Stafne, Scott)
March 3, 2023 ***Motion terminated: #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment, per the filing of the Amended Motion for Summary Judgment at dkt. #13 . (LH)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2023 3/24/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph) Modified Noting Date on 3/16/2023 (MJV).
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SP Holding Enterprises Corp, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA) Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
February 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa A Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
February 25, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (McIntosh, Joseph)
February 25, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by McCarthy & Holthus LLP. (McIntosh, Joseph)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2023. (VE)
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jeff Stenman filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McIntosh, Joseph)
February 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 3/24/2023, (McIntosh, Joseph)
February 22, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
February 22, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
February 22, 2023 Filing 3 EXHIBIT State Court Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington (McIntosh, Joseph) Modified linkage on 2/23/2023 (MJV).
February 22, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendants Quality Services Corporation of Washington, First Horizon Loan Corporation, and McCarthy & Holthus LLP (if applicable) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/1/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (RE)
February 22, 2023 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
February 22, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1 Notice of Removal: Jury Demand striken and title of Exhibit added. (RE)
February 20, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McIntosh, Joseph)
February 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 23-2-00753-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7896336), filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, Warren Lance, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(McIntosh, Joseph) Modified on 2/22/2023 to edit Jury Demand info and added document title for exhibit. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Botton v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond De Botton
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy & Holthus, LLP
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lance
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa A Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy & Holthus LLP
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Marissa A Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?