Neale v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Evan Neale
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00426
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/11/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/25/2023. (AD)
April 20, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by BNSF Railway Company.(Pierce, Britenae)
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (GMR)
April 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/14/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR)
April 5, 2023 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Evan Neale (Cohen, Coby)
April 4, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Julia Fleming on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Fleming, Julia)
April 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Britenae M.C. Pierce on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Pierce, Britenae)
April 4, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate OBH LLC, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for BNSF Railway Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Pierce, Britenae)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (JWC)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BNSF Railway Company (JWC)
March 23, 2023 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (JWC)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BNSF Railway Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7937009) Attorney Coby Cohen added to party Evan Neale(pty:pla) filed by Evan Neale. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cohen, Coby) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/23/2023) (JWC). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/23/2023) (JWC). Modified on 3/23/2023 to switcharound Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet as they were uploaded in reverse and to strike jury demand as improper (JWC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neale v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Neale
Represented By: Coby Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Britenae M.C. Pierce
Represented By: Julia Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?