Amazon.com Inc et al v. Dhuog et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC
Defendant: Dhuog doing business as Amazon Brand Registry Account and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv00484
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiffs' request to submit a status report in 120 days, by November 22, 2023, is GRANTED. If Plaintiffs cannot comply with that deadline, however, they must SHOW CAUSE by the same date why this action should not be dismissed based on Plaintiffs' failure to complete service in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (LH)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs re: #10 Order to Show Cause (Buckley, Brian)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge John H. Chun. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE within ten (10) days of the date of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m). (AD)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Brian D Buckley. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buckley, Brian)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa Lawton for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 by attorney Melissa Lawton will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Melissa Lawton) (JWC)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Armen Nercessian for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa Lawton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7979062 (Buckley, Brian)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Armen N. Nercessian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7979003 (Buckley, Brian)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Dhuog (CR)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CR)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Buckley, Brian)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against defendant(s) Dhuog, Does 1-10 (Receipt # AWAWDC-7948909) Attorney Brian D Buckley added to party Amazon.com Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Buckley added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:pla) filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #6 Letter Regarding General Order 03-23)(Buckley, Brian)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge John H. Chun added. (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc et al v. Dhuog et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Armen Nercessian
Represented By: Melissa Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Armen Nercessian
Represented By: Melissa Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhuog doing business as Amazon Brand Registry Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?