Amazon.com Inc et al v. Vivcic et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC
Defendant: Vivcic doing business as the Amazon Brand Registry Account, Does 1-10 and Vivcic doing business as Amazon Brand Registry Account
Case Number: 2:2023cv00486
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Referring Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa Lawton for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 by attorney Melissa Lawton will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Melissa Lawton) (JWC)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Armen Nercessian for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa Lawton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7979120 (Buckley, Brian)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Armen N. Nercessian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7979117 (Buckley, Brian)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge John H. Chun. Judge Tana Lin no longer assigned to the case. (KMP)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Vivcic (CR)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CR)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Tana Lin added. (CR)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Buckley, Brian)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against defendant(s) Does 1-10, Vivcic (Receipt # AWAWDC-7948916) Attorney Brian D Buckley added to party Amazon.com Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Buckley added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:pla) filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons, #6 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #7 Letter Regarding General Order 03-23)(Buckley, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc et al v. Vivcic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Armen Nercessian
Represented By: Melissa Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Armen Nercessian
Represented By: Melissa Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivcic doing business as the Amazon Brand Registry Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivcic doing business as Amazon Brand Registry Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?