Nexon Korea Corporation v. Ironmace Co Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Nexon Korea Corporation
Defendant: Ironmace Co Ltd, Ju-Hyun Choi and Terence Seungha Park
Case Number: 2:2023cv00576
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants Ironmace Co. Ltd., Ju-Hyun Choi, and Terence Seungha Park on 5/23/2023, filed by Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation. (Jost, Shannon)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, granting Pltf's #15 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. (TF)
May 15, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Terence Seungha Park (TF)
May 11, 2023 Filing 17 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Terence Seungha Park by Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Jost, Shannon)
April 28, 2023 Filing 16 DECLARATION of James S. Blackburn filed by Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation re #15 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) (Ex Parte) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H K)(Jost, Shannon) Modified on 5/1/2023 to correct exhibit listing (JF).
April 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) (Ex Parte), filed by Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/28/2023, (Jost, Shannon)
April 18, 2023 Filing 14 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ju-Hyun Choi, Ironmace Co Ltd, Terence Seungha Park (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (CR)
April 18, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CR)
April 18, 2023 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (CR)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John R Sabacinski for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney So Min Lee for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oscar D Ramallo for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James K Lee for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James S Blackburn for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY So Min Lee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7971414 (Jost, Shannon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John R. Sabacinski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7971406 (Jost, Shannon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oscar D. Ramallo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7971401 (Jost, Shannon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James K. Lee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7971390 (Jost, Shannon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James S. Blackburn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Nexon Korea Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7971378 (Jost, Shannon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nexon Co Ltd for Nexon Korea Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Nexon Korea Corporation. (Harms, Joshua)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7971119) Attorney Joshua Harms added to party Nexon Korea Corporation(pty:pla) filed by Nexon Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ironmace Co Ltd, #3 Summons Ju-Hyun Choi, #4 Summons Terence Seungha Park, #5 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Harms, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nexon Korea Corporation v. Ironmace Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nexon Korea Corporation
Represented By: James S Blackburn
Represented By: James K Lee
Represented By: Oscar D Ramallo
Represented By: Shannon M Jost
Represented By: So Min Lee
Represented By: Joshua Harms
Represented By: John R Sabacinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironmace Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ju-Hyun Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Seungha Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?