Second Amendment Foundation et al v. Ferguson et al
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Liberty Park Press, Merril Mail Marketing, Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise, Service Bureau Association, Alan Gottlieb, Citizens' Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms and Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Defendant: Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor, Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv00647
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: At the Defendant's request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/5/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/11/2023, Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marsha J. Chien on behalf of Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Chien, Marsha)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/18/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/25/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
June 12, 2023 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fraas, Lauryn)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/14/2023, (Fraas, Lauryn)
May 30, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cynthia L Alexander on behalf of Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Alexander, Cynthia)
May 25, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kendall Scott Cowles on behalf of Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Cowles, Kendall)
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lauryn K. Fraas on behalf of Defendants Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington, Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Fraas, Lauryn)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington. (MJV)
May 23, 2023 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #5 Amended Complaint,,, Summons to WA State Office of the Attorney General by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons to WA State of the Attorney General)(Lovejoy, Jack)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Robert Ferguson, Joshua Studor. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2) (SB)
May 19, 2023 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Joshua Studor, #2 Summons Robert Ferguson)(Lovejoy, Jack)
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven W Fogg on behalf of Plaintiffs Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise, Citizens' Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Alan Gottlieb, Liberty Park Press, Merril Mail Marketing, Second Amendment Foundation, Service Bureau Association. (Fogg, Steven)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise(pty:pla), Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Citizens' Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms(pty:pla), Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Alan Gottlieb(pty:pla), Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Liberty Park Press(pty:pla), Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Merril Mail Marketing(pty:pla), Attorney Jack Lovejoy added to party Service Bureau Association(pty:pla) filed by Merril Mail Marketing, Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise, Alan Gottlieb, Service Bureau Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Citizens' Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Liberty Park Press. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovejoy, Jack)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MG)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MG)
May 4, 2023 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (MG)
May 3, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lovejoy, Jack)
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7994065) filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Service Bureau Association, Merril Mail Marketing, Liberty Park Press, Alan Gottlieb, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, and Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise. (Lovejoy, Jack) Modified on 5/9/2023 to add additional filers and strike jury demand language (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Second Amendment Foundation et al v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Park Press
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merril Mail Marketing
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for the Defense of Free Enterprise
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Bureau Association
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Gottlieb
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens' Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Represented By: Jack Lovejoy
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ferguson
Represented By: Cynthia L Alexander
Represented By: Kendall Scott Cowles
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Studor
Represented By: Cynthia L Alexander
Represented By: Kendall Scott Cowles
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General's Office for the State of Washington
Represented By: Kendall Scott Cowles
Represented By: Cynthia L Alexander
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?