Doe v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation, Qualtrics International Inc., Qualtrics LLC and Qualtrics International Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00718
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Eakes, Patricia)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS] by Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Eakes, Patricia)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY, filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC, TO RESPONSE to #38 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Watts, Gregory)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY, filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC, TO RESPONSE to #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Watts, Gregory)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Eakes, Patricia)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order Denying Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Baehr, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Baehr, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana S Breaux on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Breaux, Diana)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to #38 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants Qualtrics' Motion for Judicial Notice)(Baehr, Alexander)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Parties' #50 Stipulated MOTION re Briefing Schedule for Qualtrics Defendants Request for Judicial Notice. Plaintiff's opposition to the Qualtrics Defendants RJN is due on 8/14/2023. The Qualtrics Defendants reply in support of their RJN is due on 9/11/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order re Briefing Schedule for Qualtrics Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference, filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. Noting Date 8/3/2023, (Watts, Gregory)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #38 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. Noting Date 9/11/2023, (Watts, Gregory)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re #41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kathryn Deal for DEFENDANT Microsoft Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Phillip J Wiese for Defendant Microsoft Corporation by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #41 by attorney Kathryn Deal will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Kathryn Deal) (JWC)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Parties' #45 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's oppositions to Defendants' motions to dismiss are due on 8/14/2023. Defendants' replies in support of their respective motion to dismiss are due on 9/11/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Rule 26 Disclosures, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 7/17/2023, (Eakes, Patricia)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Kathryn Deal in Support of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Eakes, Patricia)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 9/11/2023 8/11/2023, (Eakes, Patricia) Modified noting date on 7/18/2023 (SS).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Phillip J. Wiese FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8085387 (Eakes, Patricia)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathryn Deal FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8085379 (Eakes, Patricia)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia A Eakes on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Eakes, Patricia)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Sophia M. Mancall-Bitel filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC re #38 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Watts, Gregory)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/4/2023, (Watts, Gregory)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/4/2023, (Watts, Gregory)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #35 Stipulated MOTION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court EXTENDS Microsoft's response deadline 7/13/2023. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 7/6/2023, (Eakes, Patricia)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Corporate Parent Qualtrics International Inc., Corporate Parent Quartz Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Silver Lake for Qualtrics LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Qualtrics LLC. (Watts, Gregory)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Corporate Parent Quartz Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Silver Lake for Qualtrics International Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Qualtrics International Inc. (Watts, Gregory)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Parties' #30 Stipulated MOTION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Microsoft shall file its response to the Complaint on or before 7/10/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Eakes, Patricia)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 6/8/2023, (Eakes, Patricia)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/24/2023, Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2023. (KMP)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sophia Mancall-Bitel for Defendants Qualtrics International Inc and Qualtrics LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony J Weibell for Defendants Qualtrics International Inc and Qualtrics LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sophie Mancall-Bitel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8034056 (Watts, Gregory)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony J Weibell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8034044 (Watts, Gregory)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated MOTION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. The Qualtrics Defendants shall file their responses to the Complaint on or before 7/10/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney Tyre L. Tindall added for Defendants Qualtrics International Inc and Qualtrics LLC per #20 Notice of Appearance. (SS)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. Noting Date 6/1/2023, (Watts, Gregory)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SAP America, Inc., Corporate Parent SAP SE, Corporate Parent Qualtrics International Inc. for Qualtrics LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Qualtrics LLC. (Watts, Gregory)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent SAP America, Inc., Corporate Parent SAP SE for Qualtrics International Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Qualtrics International Inc. (Watts, Gregory)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory Lewis Watts on behalf of Defendants Qualtrics International Inc, Qualtrics LLC. (Watts, Gregory)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Qualtrics International, Inc. on 5/19/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Baehr, Alexander)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Qualtrics LLC on 5/18/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Baehr, Alexander)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Microsoft Corporation on 5/18/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Baehr, Alexander)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan M Rotter for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ekwan E Rhow for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Pavithra Rajesh for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kara M Wolke for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc E Masters for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Barr Benyamin for Plaintiff Jane Doe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marc E. Masters FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017997 (Baehr, Alexander)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ekwan Rhow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017974 (Baehr, Alexander)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Pavithra Rajesh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017960 (Baehr, Alexander)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kara M. Wolke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017957 (Baehr, Alexander)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan M. Rotter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017671 (Baehr, Alexander) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/24/2023) (JWC). Modified on 5/24/2023, signature issue corrected (JWC).
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Barr Benyamin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8017575 (Baehr, Alexander)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (MG)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (MG)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Baehr, Alexander)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-8009821) filed by Jane Doe.(Baehr, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Alexander A Baehr
Represented By: Barr Benyamin
Represented By: Kara M Wolke
Represented By: Marc E Masters
Represented By: Ekwan E Rhow
Represented By: Jonathan M Rotter
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Kathryn Deal
Represented By: Phillip J Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualtrics International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualtrics LLC
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Sophia Mancall-Bitel
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualtrics International Inc
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Represented By: Sophia Mancall-Bitel
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Represented By: Tyre L. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?