Codoni et al v. Port of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Codoni and Michelle Geer
Defendant: Port of Seattle, Alaska Air Group, Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Air Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00795
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David L Balser for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Parties' #40 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Second Amended Complaint. The Order continuing Defendants deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #37 ) is vacated. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 8/11/2023. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead.(MJV)
June 21, 2023 Filing 40 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc. Noting Date 6/21/2023, (Eaton, Malaika)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John H Beisner for Defendant Alaska Air Group by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David K Willingham for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Parties' #30 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Defendants Responsive Pleadings Deadline. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint shall be 7/10/2023. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (SB)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shay Dvoretzky for Defendant Alaska Air Group by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 12, 2023 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #25 by attorney David K. Willingham will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney David K. Willingham) (JWC)
June 12, 2023 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #32 by attorney David L. Balser will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney David L. Balser) (JWC)
June 12, 2023 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #26 by attorney Kelly Perigoe will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Kelly Perigoe) (JWC)
June 8, 2023 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 by attorney Shay Dvoretzky will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Shay Dvoretzky) (JWC)
June 8, 2023 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #17 by attorney John H. Beisner will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney John H. Beisner) (JWC)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Abigail D Pershing for Plaintiffs Cindy Codoni and Michelle Geer by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 6, 2023 Filing 34 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Abigail D. Pershing FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Cindy Codoni, Michelle Geer (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8036528 (Berman, Steve)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nina R Rose for Defendant Alaska Air Group by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 1, 2023 Filing 32 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David L. Balser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8031838 (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Madison H Kitchens for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 1, 2023 Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION of All Parties to Extend Defendants Responsive Pleadings Deadline, filed by Defendants Alaska Air Group, Delta Air Lines Inc, Port of Seattle. Noting Date 6/1/2023, (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Hsiao for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 1, 2023 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Madison H. Kitchens FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8031472 (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Hsiao FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8031370 (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly Perigoe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8031361 (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David K. Willingham FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8031349 (Eaton, Malaika)
June 1, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Michael P. Hatley on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc. (Hatley, Michael)
June 1, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Gregory J Hollon on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc. (Hollon, Gregory)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (MG)
May 31, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Alaska Air Group. (Maldonado, Lucio)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stacie Fletcher for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
May 31, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nina R. Rose FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Air Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8028741 (Fogg, Steven)
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John H. Beisner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Air Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8028725 (Fogg, Steven)
May 31, 2023 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shay Dvoretzky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Air Group (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8028681 (Fogg, Steven)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Winthrop Nelson for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
May 31, 2023 Judge Jamal N Whitehead added. (MG)
May 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lucio E Maldonado on behalf of Defendant Alaska Air Group. (Maldonado, Lucio)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph Edmonds for Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 26, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph Edmonds FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8025734 (Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel W. Nelson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8025730 (Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stacie B. Fletcher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8025722 (Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USDC Notice of Removal)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH STATE COURT of Malaika M. Eaton re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed in King County Sup Ct)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Nicholas Scott re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Elder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Malaika M. Eaton re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Eaton, Malaika)
May 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-07049-6; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8025291) filed by Alaska Air Group, Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Eaton, Malaika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codoni et al v. Port of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Codoni
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Sean R Matt
Represented By: Garth D Wojtanowicz
Represented By: Martin D McLean
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Abigail D Pershing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Geer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Garth D Wojtanowicz
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Martin D McLean
Represented By: Sean R Matt
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Abigail D Pershing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of Seattle
Represented By: Beth S Ginsberg
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Black
Represented By: Margarita V Latsinova
Represented By: Marie E Quasius
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Represented By: Maren Roxanne Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Lucio E Maldonado
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Nina R Rose
Represented By: Shay Dvoretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Joseph Edmonds
Represented By: Michael P. Hatley
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Represented By: David K Willingham
Represented By: Joseph Edmonds
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Represented By: Stacie Fletcher
Represented By: David L Balser
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Michael P. Hatley
Represented By: Daniel Winthrop Nelson
Represented By: Madison H Kitchens
Represented By: Peter Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?