Wilson et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: John Wilson and Jacqueline Wilson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA and Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Case Number: 2:2023cv00805
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, TO RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re First Amended Complaint (McCullough, Hugh)
July 25, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John Wilson re #31 Response to Motion (MJV)
July 24, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re First Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Wilson, John Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SS) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/26/2023 to correct error) (SS).
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #29 letter regarding Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s #26 Response to Order to Show Cause. The Court's Order to Show Cause remains discharged. Dkt. No. 28. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
July 18, 2023 Filing 29 LETTER from Plaintiff re Defendant's #26 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by John Wilson. (MJV)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. In light of Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause, Dkt. No. 26, the Court DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause, Dkt. No. 22. The Court further acknowledges the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
July 17, 2023 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Caleah Whitten re #26 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCullough, Hugh)
July 17, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA re: 22 Order to Show Cause,,,, (McCullough, Hugh)
July 10, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, to #11 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCullough, Hugh)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
July 7, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Section IV.F. of the Court's Standing Order for All Civil Cases instructs parties to "make a meaningful effort to confer prior to filing a dispositive motion," and requires any dispositive motion to "contain a certification of conferral" that is "clearly visible within either the first substantive paragraph or the final paragraph of the motion." Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA's #19 Motion to Dismiss does not contain a proper certification of conferral. Accordingly, JPMorgan Chase is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why its motion should not be stricken within 10 days of the date of this Order. The Court will discharge this order to show cause if Chase (1) certifies that it has made a meaningful effort to confer with Plaintiffs regarding the substance of its motion to dismiss; and (2) describes whether that effort has resulted in agreement on any aspects of the motion. Chase is also ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within 10 days why the Court should not deny as moot its #7 Motion to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court since that motion asks the Court to transfer--rather than dismiss with prejudice--this case. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
July 6, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re First Amended Complaint, by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington. (McDonald, Robert)
July 6, 2023 Filing 20 REQUEST by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCullough, Hugh)
July 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/28/2023, (McCullough, Hugh)
June 29, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John Wilson, to #7 MOTION to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court. (SS)
June 29, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand and for Rejection of Chase Bank's Motion to Enforce Referral, filed by Plaintiff John Wilson. Noted for 7/21/2023. (SS) Modified to terminate motion as duplicative of dkt #11 on 6/30/2023 (SS).
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 LETTER to Judge Lauren King re Certified Word Count for #14 Surreply, filed by John Wilson. (SS)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. The Court construes Plaintiff's #14 "Re: Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court" as a procedurally improper surreply and STRIKES the submission. See, e.g., Murphy v. Wedan, No. 3:21-CV-05707-BHS, 2022 WL 3018256, at *2 n.3 (W.D. Wash. July 29, 2022). The Local Civil Rules restrict the filing of surreply briefs to one situation: when a party moves to "strike material contained in or attached to a reply brief[.]" LCR 7(g). Plaintiff's submission violates LCR 7(g) because (1) it is not "strictly limited" to a request to strike and instead addresses arguments advanced in Defendant's #13 reply brief; (2) Plaintiff did not "file a notice of intent to file a surreply as soon after receiving the reply brief as practicable"; and (3) Plaintiff's submission lacks the requisite word count certification--an error the Court has already flagged with respect to Plaintiff's other filings. LCR 7(g)(1)-(3); see also Dkt. No. 12; LCR 7(e)(6). Future violations of applicable law may result in sanctions. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 *STRICKEN* SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff John Wilson re #11 MOTION to Remand. (SS) Modified on 6/27/2023 per Dkt. No. 15. (NAW)
June 23, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court (McCullough, Hugh)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Plaintiff's #8 Response to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Removal and Motion to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court and #11 Motion for Remand and for Rejection of Chase's Motion to Enforce Referral violate the Local Civil Rules. Effective February 1, 2023, motions aimed at changing the forum (e.g., motions to remand and motions to transfer) and briefs in opposition to such motions "shall not exceed 8,400 words[.]" LCR 7(e)(3). To enforce these word count limitations, Local Civil Rule 7(e)(6) requires the signature block to include "a certification of the signer as to the number of words, substantially as follows: 'I certify that this memorandum contains __ words, in compliance with the Local Civil Rules.'" Neither of Plaintiff's aforementioned submissions includes such certification. Accordingly, no later than June 28, 2023, Plaintiff must file a certification of word count for Docket Numbers #8 and #11 and identify any overlength portion(s) of those submissions. The Court will not consider any overlength portion(s). Should Plaintiff fail to file a timely certification, the Court will strike Docket Numbers #8 and #11 in their entirety. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (NAW)
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand and for Rejection of Defendant Chase Bank's Motion to Enforce Referral, filed by Plaintiff John Wilson. Noted for 7/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)
June 15, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER re #9 Verification of State Court Records, and Notice of Intent to File Motion to Remand, by John Wilson. (SS)
June 13, 2023 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCullough, Hugh)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John Wilson, to #7 MOTION to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court. (SS)
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Enforce Referral to Bankruptcy Court, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/23/2023, (McCullough, Hugh)
June 6, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lauren King for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington. (McDonald, Robert)
June 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 7/5/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (KEB)
June 2, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/9/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (MG)
June 1, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MG)
June 1, 2023 Judge David W. Christel added. (MG)
May 30, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (McCullough, Hugh)
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 23-2-03142-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8027542) Attorney Hugh R McCullough added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank NA(pty:dft) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Operative First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCullough, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Caleah Whitten
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Hugh R McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?