Hart et al v. Janicki et al
Plaintiff: Cody Hart, Derrill Fussell, Kevin Ewing, Timothy Garrison, Steven Rindal, Kathy LaFreniere, Cody R Hart, Derrill J Fussell and Kevin S Ewing
Defendant: Lisa Janicki, Ronald Wesen, Peter Browning, Donald McDermott, Richard Weyrich, Sandra Perkins, Lisa M Janicki, Ronald G Wesen, Peter A Browning, Donald L McDermott, Richard A Weyrich and Sandra F Perkins
Case Number: 2:2023cv00832
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REQUEST for Judicial Notice filed by All Plaintiffs. (SB)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Noted by clerk for 8/18/2023. (SB)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #10 MOTION to Recuse. In accordance with the Local Rules, this matter is referred to U.S. Chief District Judge David G. Estudillo for review of Plaintiffs' recusal request and this Court's denial of that request. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for Judicial Notice of Public Records in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint, Motion for Criminal Contempt, and Motion to Disqualify Defendants Attorney Eric Pedersen. (SB)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Disqualify Defendants' Attorney, filed by All Plaintiffs. Noted by clerk for 7/28/2023. (SB)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM filed by All Plaintiffs in Support of Plaintiffs' #11 MOTION for Contempt. (SB)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Contempt, filed by All Plaintiffs. Noted by clerk for 7/28/2023. (SB)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Recuse, filed by All Plaintiffs. Noted by clerk for 7/13/2023. (SB)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/14/2023, (Pedersen, Erik)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-1843-RSL, 2:22-cv-1844-JLR, 2:23-cv-00309-MJP, 2:23-cv-00404-RSL, 2:23-cv-00503-MJP, 2:23-cv-00832-MJP, 2:23-cv-00884- MJP, by Plaintiff Derrill J Fussell. (MJV)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Rylee Fleury. (MJV)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:23-CV-00309-MJP; 2:23-CV-00311-MJP; 2:23-CV-00312-MJP; 2:23-CV-00404-RSL; 2:23-CV-00503-MJP; Snohomish County Superior Court 23-2-00891-31, by All Defendants. (Pedersen, Erik)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erik Pedersen on behalf of Defendants Donald McDermott, Lisa Janicki, Peter Browning, Richard Weyrich, Ronald Wesen, Sandra Perkins. (Pedersen, Erik)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman as related to 2:23-cv-00309-MJP. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (cc: Plaintiffs via US Mail) (VE)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form. Summons provided at intake window (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MG)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. cc plaintiff via USPS (MG)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 200002188) filed by Kathy LaFreniere, Kevin Ewing, Derrill Fussell, Cody Hart, Timothy Garrison, Steven Rindal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons) (MG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. Janicki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrill Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy LaFreniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody R Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrill J Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin S Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Weyrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M Janicki
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald G Wesen
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A Browning
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L McDermott
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Weyrich
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra F Perkins
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?