CEMCO LLC v. KPSI Innovations Inc et al
Plaintiff: CEMCO, LLC and CEMCO LLC
Defendant: KPSI Innovations, Inc., Kevin Klein, Serina Klein, James A Klein and KPSI Innovations Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00918
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by KPSI Innovations Inc. (Bageant, Patrick)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/15/2023. (AD)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by All Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Serina Klein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) Noting Date 9/8/2023, (Bageant, Patrick)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick C Bageant on behalf of Defendants KPSI Innovations Inc, James A Klein, Kevin Klein, Serina Klein. (Bageant, Patrick)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas E Loop on behalf of Defendants KPSI Innovations Inc, James A Klein, Kevin Klein, Serina Klein. (Loop, Thomas)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' #23 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is 8/16/2023. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties (Trojan, R)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Serina Klein on 7/6/2023, filed by Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC. (Trojan, R)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kevin Klein on 7/6/2023, filed by Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC. (Trojan, R)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James A. Klein on 7/6/2023, filed by Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC. (Trojan, R)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant KPSI Innovations Inc on 7/6/2023 (Trojan, R)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) KPSI Innovations Inc, James A Klein, Kevin Klein, Serina Klein (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(LH)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge James L. Robart as related to 2:18-cv-00659-JLR. Judge Lauren King no longer assigned to the case. (NAW)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JFE Shoji America Holdings, Inc. for CEMCO, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CEMCO, LLC. (Trojan, R)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by CEMCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet (Amended), #11 Summons (Amended Summons) to KPSI INNOVATION, INC, #12 Summons (Amended Summons) to Serina Klein, #13 Summons (Amended Summons) to James A. Klein, #14 Summons (Amended Summons) to Kevin Klein, #15 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) (Amended))(Trojan, R)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dylan C Dang for Plaintiff CEMCO LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney R Joseph Trojan for Plaintiff CEMCO LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 by attorney Dylan C. Dang will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Dylan C. Dang) (JWC)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRAECIPE re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff CEMCO LLC (Swanson, Paul)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRAECIPE re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff CEMCO LLC (Swanson, Paul)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (JWC)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) KPSI Innovations Inc, James A Klein, Kevin Klein, Serina Klein (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (JWC)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Lauren King added. (JWC)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY R. Joseph Trojan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8054195 (Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dylan C. Dang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8054163 (Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JFE Shoji America Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent JFE Shoji Corporation, Corporate Parent JFE Holdings, Inc. for CEMCO, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CEMCO, LLC. (Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re KPSI Innovations, Inc.; Serina Klein; Kevin Klein; James A. Klein by Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff CEMCO, LLC. (Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Determination Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by CEMCO, LLC.(Swanson, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Fraudulent Transfer of Assets against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8054027) filed by CEMCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEMCO LLC v. KPSI Innovations Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEMCO, LLC
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: Dylan C Dang
Represented By: R Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEMCO LLC
Represented By: Dylan C Dang
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: R Joseph Trojan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPSI Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serina Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPSI Innovations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?