Lion Fisheries LLC v. A1 Transmission & Marine Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lion Fisheries, LLC and Lion Fisheries LLC
Defendant: A1 Transmission & Marine, Inc., J&H Marine, Inc., A1 Transmission & Marine Inc and J&H Marine Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00984
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendant J&H Marine Inc, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Park, Daniel)
August 23, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Defendant A1 Transmission & Marine Inc, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Oberg, Markus)
August 21, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Lion Fisheries LLC, to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theresa H. Rava, #2 Declaration of Paul Toste, #3 Proposed Order)(Rava, Theresa)
August 4, 2023 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Eric Koster re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendant J&H Marine Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Park, Daniel)
August 4, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, filed by Defendant J&H Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting J&H's Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 9/1/2023, (Park, Daniel)
August 2, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kurt Brodie, Sr. filed by Defendant A1 Transmission & Marine Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Oberg, Markus)
August 2, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant A1 Transmission & Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2023, (Oberg, Markus)
August 2, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/13/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/20/2023, Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2023. (KMP)
August 1, 2023 Attorney Daniel J Park added for Defendant J&H Marine Inc per the filing of Defendant's #10 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mary Catherine Butler on behalf of Defendant J&H Marine Inc. (Butler, Mary)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Markus B G Oberg on behalf of Defendant A1 Transmission & Marine Inc. (Oberg, Markus)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) A1 Transmission & Marine Inc, J&H Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (SS)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Lion Fisheries LLC. (Rava, Theresa)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint for Damages by Plaintiff Lion Fisheries LLC (Young, John)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint for Damages by Plaintiff Lion Fisheries LLC (Young, John)
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #2 Request. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CR)
July 3, 2023 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CR)
July 3, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/10/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (CR)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST by Plaintiff Lion Fisheries, LLC for Summons to A1 Transmission & Marine, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons to J&H Marine, Inc.)(Rava, Theresa)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8072012) filed by Lion Fisheries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rava, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lion Fisheries LLC v. A1 Transmission & Marine Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion Fisheries, LLC
Represented By: John Graeme Young
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion Fisheries LLC
Represented By: John Graeme Young
Represented By: Theresa H Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Transmission & Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&H Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Transmission & Marine Inc
Represented By: Julian Cano
Represented By: Markus B G Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&H Marine Inc
Represented By: Daniel J Park
Represented By: Mary Catherine Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?