Northrim Bank v. Pearl Bay Seafoods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Northrim Bank
Defendant: Pearl Bay Seafoods, LLC, Joseph Martushev, Miron I. Basargin,, Alexander I. Kalugin, Nikolai Ignatievich Basargin, Ioasoph Martushev, The Vessel Glacier Bay, Official Number 600325, Pearl Bay Seafoods LLC, Miron I Basargin, Alexander I Kalugin and Glacier Bay
Case Number: 2:2023cv01042
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K Evanson. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. (LC)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Miron I Basargin, Nikolai Ignatievich Basargin, Alexander I Kalugin, Ioasoph Martushev, Joseph Martushev, Pearl Bay Seafoods LLC. (SB)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Northrim Bank (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph Martushev 1, #2 Summons Joseph Martushev 2, #3 Summons Miron I. Basargin, #4 Summons Alexander I. Kalugin, #5 Summons Nikolai Ignatievich Basargin, #6 Summons Ioasoph Martushev)(Miles, Jesse)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE Confirmation of Notice to Maritime Lien Claimants of Vessel of Arrest and Appointment of Substitute Custodian ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Matison, Katie)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Confirmation of Notice to Owner of Vessel Arrest and Appointment of Substitute Custodian ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Matison, Katie)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Transmission of Order Authorizing Arrest and Order Appointing Substitute Custodian to Individual Defendants ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Matison, Katie)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion Appointing Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MJV)(cc: 3 certified copies USMO)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel issued electronically. (MJV) (cc: 3 certified copies USMO)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Arrest Vessel. The Clerk will issue a warrant for the arrest of the defendant vessel GLACIER BAY, Official Number 600325, her engines, machinery, boats, etc. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (MJV) (cc: 3 certified copies USMO)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE to attach document In Rem Warrant to Arrest Glacier Bay, Official Number 600325 re #4 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Glacier Bay, #6 Praecipe-Other by Plaintiff Northrim Bank (Matison, Katie)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE re #5 MOTION Order Appointing Substitute Custodian re #4 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Glacier Bay by Plaintiff Northrim Bank (Matison, Katie)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Order Appointing Substitute Custodian re #4 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Glacier Bay , filed by Plaintiff Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2023, (Matison, Katie)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel Glacier Bay, filed by Plaintiff Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/18/2023, (Matison, Katie)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/5/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/12/2023. (LC)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Northrim Bancorp, Inc. for Northrim Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Northrim Bank. (Matison, Katie)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (JWC)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # CWAWDC-8084833) filed by Northrim Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matison, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northrim Bank v. Pearl Bay Seafoods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northrim Bank
Represented By: Jesse C Miles
Represented By: Katie Belinda Smith Matison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Bay Seafoods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Martushev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miron I. Basargin,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander I. Kalugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolai Ignatievich Basargin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ioasoph Martushev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel Glacier Bay, Official Number 600325
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Bay Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miron I Basargin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander I Kalugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?