Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Viking Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Viking Group Inc, The Viking Corporation, Supply Network Inc doing business as Viking Supplynet, Viking Group Inc doing business as Viking SupplyNet and The Viking Corporation doing business as Viking SupplyNet
Case Number: 2:2023cv01112
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Parties' #18 Second Stipulated MOTION to Reset Initial Scheduling Dates. The initial scheduling deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: Deadline to Answer is 10/30/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2023, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 12/14/2023. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
September 8, 2023 Filing 18 Second Stipulated MOTION to Reset Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting 2nd Stipulated Motion to Reset Initial Scheduling Deadlines) Noting Date 9/8/2023, (Jansen, Per)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan B Acklen for Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Hogan for Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Johnathan B Acklen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8129693 (Silver, Marnie)
August 18, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel Hogan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8129683 (Silver, Marnie)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION to Reset Initial Scheduling Dates. The FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/9/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/23/2023, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/30/2023. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Reset Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2023, (Jansen, Per)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/24/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/7/2023. (AD)
August 1, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Ohio Security Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Silver, Marnie)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Parties' #8 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the Complaint is reset to 9/15/2023. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
July 31, 2023 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 7/31/2023, (Jansen, Per)
July 31, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Ohio Security Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Silver, Marnie)
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Marnie Hillary Silver. Filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Silver, Marnie)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MG)
July 26, 2023 Judge James L. Robart added. (MG)
July 26, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/2/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (MG)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants (Jansen, Per)
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Viking Group Inc for Supply Network Inc, The Viking Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Defendants. (Jansen, Per)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by All Defendants (Jansen, Per)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-10719-5-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8099577) Attorney Per D. Jansen added to party Supply Network Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Per D. Jansen added to party The Viking Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Per D. Jansen added to party Viking Group Inc(pty:dft) filed by The Viking Corporation, Viking Group Inc, Supply Network Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jansen, Per)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Viking Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Marnie Hillary Silver
Represented By: Daniel Hogan
Represented By: Jonathan B Acklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Group Inc
Represented By: Per D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Viking Corporation
Represented By: Per D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supply Network Inc doing business as Viking Supplynet
Represented By: Per D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Group Inc doing business as Viking SupplyNet
Represented By: Per D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Viking Corporation doing business as Viking SupplyNet
Represented By: Per D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?