Traverse Therapy Services PLLC v. Sadler-Bridges Wellness Group PLLC et al
Case Number: 2:2023cv01239
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. The Court DECLINES to convert Defendants' Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment given it did not rely on the evidence submitted by Defendants. Having reviewed the briefs, the Court finds Traverse has sufficiently alleged a claim under the DTSA. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures. The Court finds that $4,100 in attorney's fees described in Spurgeon's declaration is reasonable and order Defendants to pay Plaintiff $4,100 for the instant motion to compel and request for sanctions. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Parties' 38 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff. The discovery motion cutoff date is extended to 1/30/2024. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traverse Therapy Services PLLC v. Sadler-Bridges Wellness Group PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?