Ferguson et al v. F/V The Porn Star et al
Plaintiff: Lee Ferguson, Perry Sandberg and Mobile Fleet Service Welding and Repair LLC
Defendant: F/V The Porn Star, Dann Ray Ireland, Louisa Case, Kevin F Gollischewski, Doujsha A Edwards, John Doe One, John Doe Two and Alpha Recycle LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01338
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Objection to Order, Reply to Report and Recomendation with Brief Summary to Show Cause in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (SB)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Plaintiffs' #3 #4 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends that both Plaintiffs' applications to proceed IFP (dkt. # #3 - #4 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2023, Noting Date 9/29/2023. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (SB) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
August 31, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Lee Ferguson. (SB)
August 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Lee Ferguson. (SB)
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Perry Sandberg. (SB)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 PROPOSED Complaint and Motion. ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/28/2023 to correct IFP application (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS w/ IFP forms) (JWC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2023) (JWC).
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint for the Arrest of Vessel Porn Star, In Rem AND Motion to be Temporarily Afforded 10 Days to Correct Procedural Issues with Libel, to Hold in Abeyance Judge or Magistrate Review of In Rem Request for Warrant filed by Plaintiffs Lee Ferguson, Perry Sandberg (No Filing Fee Paid/No IFP Applications Filed) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JWC) Modified on 8/29/2023 to correct document title (JWC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson et al v. F/V The Porn Star et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Fleet Service Welding and Repair LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V The Porn Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dann Ray Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin F Gollischewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doujsha A Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Recycle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?