Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority v. Pike Place Fish Market Inc
Plaintiff: Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority
Defendant: Pike Place Fish Market Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01373
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/15/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2023. (KMP)
November 2, 2023 Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties' #29 Stipulated Notice. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint is extended to 11/6/2023 and the deadline for the Plaintiff to submit any supplemental materials in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended to 11/6/2023. (MJV)
November 1, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE (Stipulated) Extending Certain Deadlines ; filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. (Savitt, James)
September 26, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca Luise Solomon on behalf of Defendant Pike Place Fish Market Inc. (Solomon, Rebecca)
September 26, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kim D Stephens on behalf of Defendant Pike Place Fish Market Inc. (Stephens, Kim)
September 22, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John J Bamert on behalf of Defendant Pike Place Fish Market Inc. (Bamert, John)
September 22, 2023 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #18 NOTICE (Stipulated) Regarding Deadlines Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction was improperly signed by John J. Bamert. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Rondi Greer filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41-66, #2 Exhibit 67-72, #3 Exhibit 73-82, #4 Exhibit 83-86, #5 Exhibit 87 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 87 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 87 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 87 Part 4, #9 Exhibit 87 Part 5, #10 Exhibit 87 Part 6, #11 Exhibit 87 Part 7, #12 Exhibit 87 Part 8, #13 Exhibit 88-100, #14 Exhibit 101-122, #15 Exhibit 31)(Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Karin Moughamer filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Zack Cook filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Amy Wallsmith filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Mary Bacarella filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 20 DECLARATION of John Turnbull filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18) (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renoted Pursuant to Dkt 18), filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/15/2023, (Savitt, James)
September 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE (Stipulated) Regarding Deadlines Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Related Terms to Allow for Mediation ; filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. (Savitt, James)
September 20, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Service of Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declarations in Support of Same on Pike Place Fish Market, Inc. (served on 9/7/2023) by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority (Savitt, James)
September 20, 2023 Filing 16 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Pike Place Fish Market Inc on 9/7/2023 (Savitt, James)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This motion and its accompanying declarations (Dkt. Nos. #3 #9 ) are STRICKEN. Plaintiff may renew its motion at an appropriate time and with the requisite notice to Defendant. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (SS)
September 11, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K Evanson for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP)
September 8, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Tana Lin. District Judge Kymberly K Evanson no longer assigned to the case. (DS)
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Pike Place Fish Market Inc (CR)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CR)
September 7, 2023 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (CR)
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of Rondi Greer filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41-66, #2 Exhibit 67-72, #3 Exhibit 73-82, #4 Exhibit 83-86, #5 Exhibit 87 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 87 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 87 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 87 Part 4, #9 Exhibit 87 Part 5, #10 Exhibit 87 Part 6, #11 Exhibit 87 Part 7, #12 Exhibit 87 Part 8, #13 Exhibit 88-100, #14 Exhibit 101-122, #15 Exhibit 31)(Savitt, James) Modified to strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of Karin Moughamer filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Savitt, James) Modified to strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of Zack Cook filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Savitt, James) Modified strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of Amy Wallsmith filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Savitt, James) Modified strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of Mary Bacarella filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Savitt, James) Modified to strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 *STRICKEN* DECLARATION of John Turnbull filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Savitt, James) Modified to strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 *STRICKEN* MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/29/2023, (Savitt, James) Modified to strike on 9/20/2023 (SS).
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. (Savitt, James)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Breach of Contract, Trademark Dilution, Unfair Competition, Declaratory Judgment, and False and Fraudulent Procurement of Trademark Registrations against defendant(s) Pike Place Fish Market Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-8151068) Attorney James P Savitt added to party Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority(pty:pla) filed by Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Savitt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority v. Pike Place Fish Market Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pike Place Market Preservation and Development Authority
Represented By: Brandi Buehn Balanda
Represented By: Christopher James Lindemeier
Represented By: Jacob P Freeman
Represented By: Sarah Gohmann Bigelow
Represented By: James P Savitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike Place Fish Market Inc
Represented By: John J Bamert
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?