Duffy v. Yardi Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mckenna Duffy and Michael Brett
Defendant: Yardi Systems, Inc., Bridge Property Management, LLC, Calibrate Property Management, LLC, Clear Property Management LLC, Dalton Management, Inc., HNN Associates, LLC, LeFever Mattson, Manco Abbott, Inc., Morguard Corporation, Pillar Properties, LLC, Summit Management Services, Inc., Creekwood Property Corporation, Legacy Partners, Inc., Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated, Yardi Systems Inc, Bridge Property Management LC, Calibrate Property Management LLC, Dalton Management Inc, HNN Associates LLC, Manco Abbott Inc, Pillar Properties LLC, Summit Management Services Inc, Legacy Partners Inc and R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01391
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC by Plaintiffs Michael Brett, Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) against defendant(s) Bridge Property Management LC, Calibrate Property Management LLC, Creekwood Property Corporation, Dalton Management Inc, HNN Associates LLC, LeFever Mattson, Manco Abbott Inc, Morguard Corporation, Summit Management Services Inc, Yardi Systems Inc, R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC with JURY DEMAND Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Michael Brett(pty:pla) filed by Mckenna Duffy, Michael Brett. (Attachments: #1 Redline of First Amended Complaint)(Berman, Steve)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re #107 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael A Swartzendruber for DEFENDANT Creekwood Property Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Legacy Partners Inc, filed by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Berman, Steve)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Calibrate Property Management LLC. (Cassubhai, Hozaifa)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re #106 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eliot Turner for DEFENDANT Creekwood Property Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #75 Motion to Substitute. Plaintiff may, within three days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint that replaces Pillar Properties, LLC, with R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael A. Swartzendruber FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Creekwood Property Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8222190 (Fogarty, Paul)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eliot Turner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Creekwood Property Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8222165 (Fogarty, Paul)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Clear Property Management LLC, filed by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Berman, Steve)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Molly McDonald for Defendant Bridge Property Management LC. (McDonald, Molly)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Creekwood Property Corporation. (Fogarty, Paul)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul E Fogarty on behalf of Defendant Creekwood Property Corporation. (Fogarty, Paul)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Burnside on behalf of Defendant Calibrate Property Management LLC. (Burnside, William)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hozaifa Y Cassubhai on behalf of Defendant Calibrate Property Management LLC. (Cassubhai, Hozaifa)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #92 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kenneth Racowski for Defendant Legacy Partners Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Geographical location waived for local counsel per #89 Order. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #92 by attorney Kenneth Racowski will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Kenneth Racowski) (JWC)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Joseph P. Corr and Jacob M Downs for Defendant Summit Management Services Inc. (Downs, Jacob)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Stipulated MOTION. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd A Bowers on behalf of Defendant Summit Management Services Inc. (Bowers, Todd)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adrianna Simonelli on behalf of Defendant HNN Associates LLC. (Simonelli, Adrianna)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Stipulated MOTION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE/PROCEDURE AND RULE 26 DEADLINES, filed by Defendant Yardi Systems Inc. Noting Date 10/18/2023, (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by LeFever Mattson. (Rich, Steven)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kenneth Racowski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Legacy Partners Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8204378 (Asai, Kristin)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re #87 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jessica Nelson for DEFENDANT Manco Abbott Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re #86 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Donald Heeman for DEFENDANT Manco Abbott Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Waive Geographic Requirement in LCR 83.1. Kristin Asai may serve as local counsel in this matter and file pro hac vice applications under LCR 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Manco Abbott Inc. (Walker, Valerie)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jessica J. Nelson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Manco Abbott Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8201497 (Walker, Valerie)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Donald Heeman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Manco Abbott Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8201482 (Walker, Valerie)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney Mathew L Harrington added for Defendant Manco Abbott Inc; per #85 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Valerie A Walker on behalf of Defendant Manco Abbott Inc. (Walker, Valerie)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION to Waive Geographic Requirement in LCR 83.1 , filed by Defendant Legacy Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/12/2023, (Asai, Kristin)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #65 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party Name and Change Caption. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #71 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mackenzie Grey Newman for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #70 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen M Medlock for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re #69 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Molly McDonald for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re #68 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Madison Lo for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re #67 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney M Kevin Costello for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re #66 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dylan I Ballard for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set/Reset re Plaintiff's #75 MOTION to Substitute (Plaintiff's Motion to Deem R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC Substituted for Pillar Properties, LLC). Noting date reset by clerk for 10/27/2023 per LCR 7(d)(3). (KRA)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Mariko Asai on behalf of Defendant Legacy Partners Inc. (Asai, Kristin)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Substitute (Plaintiff's Motion to Deem R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC Substituted for Pillar Properties, LLC), filed by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2023 10/20/2023, (Berman, Steve) Modified noting date on 10/11/2023 (KRA).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #72 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael W. Scarborough for DEFENDANT Bridge Property Management LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re #64 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ryan M Sandrock for DEFENDANT LeFever Mattson, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael W. Scarborough FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196274 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mackensie Grey Newman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196261 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen M. Medlock FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196257 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Molly McDonald FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196247 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Madison Lo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196233 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY M. Kevin Costello FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196225 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dylan I. Ballard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8196216 (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Party Name and Change Caption, filed by Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC. Noting Date 10/10/2023, (Van Kampen, Al)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ryan Sandrock FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant LeFever Mattson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8195806 (Rich, Steven)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven Rich on behalf of Defendant LeFever Mattson. (Rich, Steven)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Summit Management Services Inc. (Downs, Jacob)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Bridge Property Management LLC. (Van Kampen, Al)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Al Van Kampen on behalf of Defendant Bridge Property Management LLC. (Van Kampen, Al)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2023. (VE)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen W Funk for DEFENDANT Summit Management Services Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Creekwood Property Corporation mailed on 9/19/2023 (Berman, Steve)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen W. Funk FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Summit Management Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8189571 (Downs, Jacob)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Parties' #43 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for all Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued to 11/17/2023. The parties will submit a proposed briefing schedule to the Court within 14 days of the entry of the order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SB)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #47 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Abraham A Tabaie for DEFENDANT Yardi Systems Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristin D Kiehn for DEFENDANT Yardi Systems Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #45 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Schaper for DEFENDANT Yardi Systems Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #44 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maura Kathleen Monaghan for DEFENDANT Yardi Systems Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney Joseph P. Corr added for Summit Management Services Inc, per the filing of Defendant's #42 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Yardi Systems Inc. (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #38 Notice of Appearance. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SB)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by HNN Associates LLC. (Perez, David)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Abraham Tabaie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yardi Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8188300 (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristin D. Kiehn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yardi Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8188291 (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Schaper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yardi Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8188284 (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maura Kathleen Monaghan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Yardi Systems Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8188239 (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed Order], filed by Defendant Yardi Systems Inc. Noting Date 10/3/2023, (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob M Downs on behalf of Defendant Summit Management Services Inc. (Downs, Jacob)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Carvalho on behalf of Defendant Yardi Systems Inc. (Carvalho, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney Brian S Epley added for Dalton Management Inc, per the filing of Defendant's #39 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorneys Elvira Castillo, Tiffany L Lee, Marten N King added for HNN Associates LLC, per the filing of Defendant's #38 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Dalton Management Inc. (Monson, Jonathan)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan W. Monson on behalf of Defendant Dalton Management Inc. (Monson, Jonathan)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A. Perez on behalf of Defendant HNN Associates LLC. (Perez, David)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Pillar Properties LLC, filed by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Berman, Steve)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated, filed by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Berman, Steve)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Clear Property Management LLC on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned unexecuted upon defendant Clear Property Management LLC on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve) Modified from executed to unexecuted on 9/21/2023 (KRA).
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Manco Abbott Inc on 9/18/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated on 9/18/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Calibrate Property Management LLC on 9/18/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Morguard Corporation on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Dalton Management Inc on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Summit Management Services Inc on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Bridge Property Management LLC on 9/15/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Legacy Partners Inc on 9/14/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant LeFever Mattson on 9/14/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant HNN Associates LLC on 9/14/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Yardi Systems Inc on 9/14/2023 (Berman, Steve)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Xiaoyi Fan on behalf of Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Fan, Xiaoyi)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie A Verdoia on behalf of Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Verdoia, Stephanie)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rio S Pierce for Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (SB)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Yardi Systems, Inc. by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Summit Management Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Pillar Properties, LLC by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Morguard Corporation by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Manco Abbott, Inc. by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Legacy Partners, Inc. by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant LeFever Mattson by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant HNN Associates, LLC by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Dalton Management, Inc. by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Creekwood Property Corporation by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Clear Property Management, LLC by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Calibrate Property Management, LLC by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Bridge Property Management, LLC by Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Berman, Steve)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rio S. Pierce FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8159220 (Berman, Steve)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Theodore J Wojcik on behalf of Plaintiff Mckenna Duffy. (Wojcik, Theodore)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc via ad hoc, Attorneys Verdoia and Fan(CDA)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MG)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Bridge Property Management, LLC, Calibrate Property Management, LLC, Clear Property Management LLC, Creekwood Property Corporation, Dalton Management, Inc., HNN Associates, LLC, Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated, LeFever Mattson, Legacy Partners, Inc., Manco Abbott, Inc., Morguard Corporation, Pillar Properties, LLC, Summit Management Services, Inc., Yardi Systems, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8155547) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Mckenna Duffy(pty:pla) filed by Mckenna Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Yardi Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mckenna Duffy
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rio S Pierce
Represented By: Theodore J Wojcik
Represented By: Stephanie A Verdoia
Represented By: Xiaoyi Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yardi Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calibrate Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNN Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeFever Mattson
Represented By: Ryan M Sandrock
Represented By: Steven Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manco Abbott, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morguard Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillar Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekwood Property Corporation
Represented By: Eliot Turner
Represented By: Michael A Swartzendruber
Represented By: Paul E Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang LaSalle Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yardi Systems Inc
Represented By: Kristin D Kiehn
Represented By: Maura Kathleen Monaghan
Represented By: Abraham A Tabaie
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Matthew Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Property Management LC
Represented By: Mackenzie Grey Newman
Represented By: Madison Lo
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Stephen M Medlock
Represented By: Al Van Kampen
Represented By: Molly McDonald
Represented By: M Kevin Costello
Represented By: Dylan I Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calibrate Property Management LLC
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Represented By: William Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton Management Inc
Represented By: Brian S Epley
Represented By: Jonathan W. Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNN Associates LLC
Represented By: David A. Perez
Represented By: Elvira Castillo
Represented By: Adrianna Simonelli
Represented By: Marten N King
Represented By: Tiffany L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manco Abbott Inc
Represented By: Jessica Nelson
Represented By: Donald Heeman
Represented By: Mathew L Harrington
Represented By: Valerie A Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillar Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Services Inc
Represented By: Stephen W Funk
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Represented By: Joseph P. Corr
Represented By: Todd A Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Partners Inc
Represented By: Kenneth Racowski
Represented By: Kristin Mariko Asai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. Merrill Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?