Oregon Sealark LLC v. Olson Marine Inc
Plaintiff: Oregon Sealark, LLC and Olson Marine Inc.
Defendant: Olson Marine Inc
Counter Defendant: Oregon Sealark LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01445
Filed: September 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Plaintiff Oregon Sealark LLC.(Jarrett, Noah)
October 23, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Oregon Sealark LLC by Olson Marine Inc.(McLean, Donald)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Olson Marine Inc mailed on 9/15/2023 (Jarrett, Noah)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/16/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2023. (AD)
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Oregon Sealark LLC. (Jarrett, Noah)
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Olson Marine Inc. (McLean, Donald)
September 20, 2023 Attorney Sarai Salgado-Miranda added for Olson Marine Inc per Defendant's #4 Notice of Appearance. (KRA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 DISREGARDNotice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. docket in errror (MG) Modified on 9/19/2023 (MG).
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald K McLean on behalf of Defendant Olson Marine Inc.. (McLean, Donald)
September 19, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #5 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter : Entry stricken docketed in error (MG)
September 19, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/26/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MG)
September 19, 2023 Judge John H. Chun added. (MG)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David R Boyajian on behalf of Plaintiff Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Boyajian, David)
September 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Jarrett, Noah)
September 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Olson Marine Inc. (Receipt # AWAWDC-8165380) Attorney Noah Jarrett added to party Oregon Sealark, LLC(pty:pla) filed by Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint)(Jarrett, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Sealark LLC v. Olson Marine Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Sealark, LLC
Represented By: Noah Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olson Marine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Oregon Sealark LLC
Represented By: Noah Jarrett
Represented By: David R Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olson Marine Inc
Represented By: Donald K McLean
Represented By: Sarai Salgado-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?