PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC v. Fritts et al
Plaintiff: PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC
Defendant: James Fritts and RI Insurance Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01468
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven W. Shuldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #30 will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Steven W. Shuldman) (JWC)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by All Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/1/2023, (Schumacher, Neil)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #31 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Traci Zeller for DEFENDANTS James Fritts and RI Insurance Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John S Darden for DEFENDENTS James Fritts and RI Insurance Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Traci Zeller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8225135 (Keller, Bradley)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven W. Shuldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. Receipt No. AWAWDC-8225087 (Keller, Bradley)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DISREGARD/ see corrected application at dkt #30 . APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven W. Shuldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8225087 (Keller, Bradley) Modified on 11/1/2023 strike entry, correctly re-filed at dkt #30 (CDA).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John S. Darden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8225073 (Keller, Bradley)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, : Entry stricken, correctly re-filed application at Dkt #30 (CDA)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Parties' #26 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Briefs. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Over-Length Briefs, filed by Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. Noting Date 10/30/2023, (Tondini, John)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/6/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/13/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2023. (KMP)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #21 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time. The Court extends Defendants' deadline to file any motion, answer, or other responsive pleading to 11/2/2023. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neil J Schumacher for Defendants James Fritts and RI Insurance Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradley Bondi for Defendants James Fritts and RI Insurance Services LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) Modified on 10/11/2023 to reflect attorney's full name (JWC).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time, filed by Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. Noting Date 10/10/2023, (Keller, Bradley)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Attorney John Arthur Tondini added for James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC per the filing of Defendants' #17 Notice of Appearance. (KRA)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #20 by attorney Neil J. Schumacher will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Neil J. Schumacher) (JWC)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #18 by attorney Brad Bondi will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Jesse Curry at 206-370-8439 or #jesse_curry@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Brad Bondi) (JWC)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neil J. Schumacher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. Receipt No. AWAWDC-8193957 (Keller, Bradley)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. (Keller, Bradley)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brad Bondi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8193932 (Keller, Bradley)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bradley S Keller on behalf of Defendants James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC. (Keller, Bradley)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on RI Insurance Services LLC on 9/22/2023, filed by Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC. (Parris, Mark)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James Fritts on 9/22/2023, filed by Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC. (Parris, Mark)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul J Lockwood for Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Cliff C Gardner for Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew P. Majarian for PLAINTIFF PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elisa M. C. Klein for PLAINTIFF PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) James Fritts, RI Insurance Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CR)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CR)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew P. Majarian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8172787 (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul J. Lockwood FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8172777 (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elisa M. C. Klein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8172766 (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cliff C. Gardner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8172757 (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Peter C. Foy & Associates Insurance Services, LLC, Corporate Parent PCF Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent PCF Midco II, LLC, Corporate Parent PCF Midco I, LLC, Corporate Parent PCF Holdco, LLC for PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC. (Parris, Mark)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8171984) Attorney Mark Steven Parris added to party PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC(pty:pla) filed by PCF Insurance Services of the West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parris, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC v. Fritts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCF Insurance Services of the West LLC
Represented By: Elisa M. C. Klein
Represented By: Mark Steven Parris
Represented By: Cliff C Gardner
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Paul J Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fritts
Represented By: Bradley J Bondi
Represented By: Neil J Schumacher
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: John S Darden
Represented By: Traci Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RI Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley J Bondi
Represented By: Neil J Schumacher
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Traci Zeller
Represented By: John S Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?