Federal Trade Commission et al v. Amazon.com Inc Featured Case

A case filed by the Federal Trade Commission and 17 state attorneys general which aledges Amazon has abused its powers to raise prices for shoppers and levy high fees against businesses that sell on its platform.

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission, State of New York, State of Connecticut, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Delaware, State of Maine, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Wisconsin
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Intervenor: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01495
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caleb J. Smith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Oklahoma (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205977 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracy W. Wertz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205829 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 47 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer A. Thomson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205820 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 46 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brandon S. Sprecher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205790 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 45 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James Yoon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205623 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 44 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy McFarlane FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205617 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 43 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Jo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205604 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elinor R. Hoffmann FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205579 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 41 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen N. Provazza FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8205509 (Smith, Timothy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for proceedings held on 10/17/2023 re 37 Telephone Conference,,. Requesting Attorney: Edward H Takashima.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Nickoline Drury (nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Takashima, Edward)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rahul A Darwar for PLAINTIFF State of Connecticut, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #32 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra C Sosnowski for PLAINTIFF State of New Hampshire, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John H. Chun - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: FTC: Edward Takashima; States: Timothy Smith; Def Counsel: Heidi Hubbard; CR: Nickie Drury; Telephone Conference held on 10/17/2023. The Court and counsel discuss a potential recusal issue. As the parties state they have no concerns, the Court will retain the case. The Court and counsel also discuss the Amazon's Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. #27 ). As stated on the record, the Court suspends the LCR 26(f) deadlines. (AD)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lucas J Tucker for PLAINTIFF State of Nevada, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David C Kiernan for INTERVENOR Walmart, Inc., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Koren W Wong-Ervin for INTERVENOR Walmart, Inc., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
October 17, 2023 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lucas J. Tucker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Nevada (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8204241 (Smith, Timothy)
October 17, 2023 Filing 32 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra C. Sosnowski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New Hampshire (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8204009 (Smith, Timothy)
October 17, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/17/2023, (Farmer, Tyler)
October 17, 2023 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicole Demers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Connecticut (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8203709 (Smith, Timothy)
October 17, 2023 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rahul A. Darwar FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Connecticut (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8203670 (Smith, Timothy)
October 17, 2023 Attorney Ariel A Martinez added for Walmart, Inc., per Intervenor's #24 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
October 16, 2023 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Kevin M. Hodges filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Eakes, Patricia)
October 16, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2023, (Eakes, Patricia)
October 16, 2023 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David C. Kiernan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Intervenor Walmart, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8202307 (Farmer, Tyler)
October 16, 2023 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Koren W. Wong-Ervin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Intervenor Walmart, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8202281 (Farmer, Tyler)
October 16, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer on behalf of Intervenor Walmart, Inc.. (Farmer, Tyler)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Plaintiff States' #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without Association with Local Counsel with an Office within the District. It is further ORDERED that attorneys for Plaintiff States are permitted to designate Timothy D. Smith, Senior Assistant Attorney General at the Oregon Department of Justice and counsel for the Plaintiff State of Oregon, as local counsel. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
October 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, 10/17/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge John H. Chun. (AD)
October 10, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:23-cv-01523, by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Takashima, Edward)
October 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to APPEAR PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL COUNSEL WITH AN OFFICE WITHIN THE DISTRICT, filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. Noting Date 10/10/2023, (Smith, Timothy)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Temporarily Seal the Complaint. Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. #3 ) shall be temporarily sealed. Amazon or any other producing party shall file any motion to permanently seal parts of the Complaint no later than 10/27/2023. If no producing party files a motion to permanently seal parts of the Complaint by 10/27/2023, the Clerk of the Court shall unseal the Complaint. The FTC's original Motion for Leave to Temporarily Seal Portions of the Complaint (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
October 6, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Seal for Entry of Order Resolving Plaintiff FTC's Motion for Leave to Temporarily Seal the Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/6/2023, (Takashima, Edward)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas O Barnett for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin M Hodges for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Heidi K Hubbard for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 3, 2023 Attorney Molly A Terwilliger added for Amazon.com Inc, per the filing of Defendant's #10 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
October 2, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Eakes, Patricia)
October 2, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas O. Barnett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8186835 (Eakes, Patricia)
October 2, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin M. Hodges FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8186831 (Eakes, Patricia)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Heidi K. Hubbard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8186822 (Eakes, Patricia)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia A Eakes on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Eakes, Patricia)
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com, Inc. on 9/28/2023, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Musser, Susan)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Timothy D. Smith. Filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Smith, Timothy)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc (JWC)
September 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in D.C. Super. Ct., Cal. Super. Ct., S.D.N.Y., case number(s) in other court 2021 CA 001775 B, CGC-22-601826, 1:22-cv-09542; filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Musser, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00424, 2:21-cv-00693, 2:21-cv-00996, by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Musser, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT Complaint by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission re #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint (Musser, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/13/2023, (Musser, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. Attorney Susan A Musser added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Amazon.com, Inc.)(Musser, Susan) (No Fee Required)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. Attorney Susan A Musser added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Amazon.com, Inc.)(Musser, Susan) (No Fee Required)
September 26, 2023 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (JWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Edward H Takashima
Represented By: Christina F Shackelford
Represented By: Christine M Kennedy
Represented By: Colin M Herd
Represented By: Daniel S Bradley
Represented By: Daniel A Principato
Represented By: Danielle C Quinn
Represented By: David B Schwartz
Represented By: Emily K Bolles
Represented By: Emma P Dick
Represented By: Jake O Walter-Warner
Represented By: Kelly M Schoolmeester
Represented By: Megan E B Henry
Represented By: Sara M Divett
Represented By: Stephen E Antonio
Represented By: Z Lily Rudy
Represented By: Susan A Musser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth McFarlane
Represented By: James Yoon
Represented By: Elinor R Hoffmann
Represented By: Michael Youngho Jo
Represented By: Tal M Elmatad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Nicole Demers
Represented By: Rahul A Darwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Brandon S Sprecher
Represented By: Jennifer A Thomson
Represented By: Tracy Wright Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Brian Canfield
Represented By: Michael A Undorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Christina M Moylan
Represented By: Michael Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Byron Warren
Represented By: Gary Honick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Michael Bruce MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Jason Evans
Represented By: Jonathan Comish
Represented By: Scott A Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Sarah Doktori
Represented By: Zach Biesanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Lucas J Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Alexandra C Sosnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Ana Atta-Alla
Represented By: Isabella R Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Jeff Dan Herrera
Represented By: Julie Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Caleb J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Timothy D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Stephen N Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Gwendolyn J Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Heidi K Hubbard
Represented By: Kevin M Hodges
Represented By: Thomas O Barnett
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Molly A Terwilliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: David C Kiernan
Represented By: Koren W Wong-Ervin
Represented By: Ariel A Martinez
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?