Harris et al v. Kent Police Department Detective et al
Plaintiff: Dwight Harris
Defendant: Kent Police Department Detective, Vancouver SWAT Team, King County Jail, King County Courthouse and Other Detective to be Named a Party to this Matter
Case Number: 2:2023cv01510
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A PROPER PLEADING by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Plaintiff shall submit a proper pleading to the Court not later than thirty (30) days from the date on which this Order is entered. The Clerk will provide Plaintiff a copy of the Courts standard complaint form to assist him in preparing a proper pleading. Plaintiff is advised that he should carefully complete all applicable portions of the form and he should ensure that his writing is legible. Plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunctive relief and for appointment of counsel (dkt. # 4-1, 5) are STRICKEN. Plaintiff may re-file those motions for consideration once he has submitted a proper pleading for the Court to review. (cc: Order and 1983 forms to plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance) (cc: Plaintiff and King County Jail Finance Dept. via USPS) (CR)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 STRICKEN PROPOSED Motion for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dwight Harris (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order) (CR) Modified on 11/14/2023 stricken per #7 Order (CR).
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Dwight Harris before Judge Michelle L. Peterson STRICKEN (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, # (2) Prison Trust Account Statement) Modified on 11/14/2023 stricken per #7 Order (CR).
October 25, 2023 Deficiency corrected. IFP and Prison Trust Account Statement received. (CR)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/30/2023 to correct IFP application (cc: Letter and IFP form to plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 DISREGARD, SEE DKT #3 WITH CORRECTED CASE NUMBER Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/30/2023 to correct IFP application (cc: Letter and IFP form to plaintiff via USPS) (CR) Modified on 9/29/2023 strike entry (CR).
September 29, 2023 Judge James L. Robart added. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to case. (CR)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 PROPOSED Motion Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Dwight Harris (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Kent Police Department Detective et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Police Department Detective
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vancouver SWAT Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Detective to be Named a Party to this Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?