Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust and Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Defendant: Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC and Sound Floors LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01650
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *2-3 days*. Bench Trial is set for 2/10/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 1/18/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/15/2024, Discovery Motions due by 8/14/2024, Discovery completed by 9/13/2024, Dispositive motions due by 10/15/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/12/2024, Motions in Limine due by 1/6/2025, Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/27/2025, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/27/2025, Deposition Designations due by 1/27/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 2-3. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC, Sound Floors LLC.(Scuderi, Joseph)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/6/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2023. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph Scuderi on behalf of Defendants Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC, Sound Floors LLC. (Scuderi, Joseph)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC, Sound Floors LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (MG)
October 31, 2023 District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (MG)
October 31, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/7/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (MG)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8220545) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust(pty:pla) filed by Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust, Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust et al v. Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of Cement Masons & Plasterers Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons and Plasterers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Cement Masons Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Floors Gypsum Concrete LLC
Represented By: Joseph Scuderi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Floors LLC
Represented By: Joseph Scuderi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?