O.E. v. HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc et al
Plaintiff: O. E.
Defendant: HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc., Sonesta International Hotels Corporation, Abrdurakhmon Mukhammadjonov and HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01748
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/24/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2024, Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Apolinar Montero-Sanchez on behalf of Plaintiff O. E.. (Montero-Sanchez, Apolinar)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Middleton, Jacqueline)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason Llewellyn Kafoury on behalf of Plaintiff O. E.. (Kafoury, Jason)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal by HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation.(Shore, James)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacqueline Middleton on behalf of Defendants HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. (Middleton, Jacqueline)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc plaintiff's counsel via ad hoc and USPS) (RE)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Attorney Admission. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ad hoc unadmitted attorneys) (RE)
November 16, 2023 District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc., Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. (Shore, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Service Properties Trust for HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc.. (Shore, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sonesta Holdco Corporation for Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. (Shore, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of James M. Shore re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc., Sonesta International Hotels Corporation (Shore, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-18898-5 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8242700) filed by HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc., Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Shore, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.E. v. HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. E.
Represented By: Apolinar Montero-Sanchez
Represented By: Jason Llewellyn Kafoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPT TRS IHG-2, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Middleton
Represented By: James M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonesta International Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Jacqueline Middleton
Represented By: James M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abrdurakhmon Mukhammadjonov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPT TRS IHG-2 Inc
Represented By: James M Shore
Represented By: Jacqueline Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?