Rawlings v. American Optical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rawlings
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc., American Optical Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Baker Perkins, Inc., C.H. Murphy / Clark-Ullman, Inc., BW/IP, INC., P-G Industries, Inc., Carrier Corporation, FMC Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Paramount Global, Spirax Sarco, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Inductotherm Corporation, North American Manufacturing Company, Jenkins Bros, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, pfizer inc., Redco Corporation, Valves and Controls US, Inc., Wagstaff, Inc., Triple A. Machine Shop, Inc., Whiting Corporation, WT/HRC Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, York International Corporation, Apex Tool and Manufacturing, Inc., Boss Manufacturing Company, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY, Flowserve US Inc., Fluor Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Foundry Service & Supplies, Inc., Fraser-Edwards Company, Gould Pumps, Incorporated, H.D. Fowler Co., Inc., JT THORPE & SONS, INC., KONECRANES, INC., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, PYROTEC IN CORPORATED, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., SCHMITT ELECTRIC, INC., SPANCO, WADECO, Schneider Electric USA Inc, Valves and Controls US Inc, Apex Tool and Manufacturing Inc, Armstrong International Inc, Baker Perkins Inc, BW/IP Inc, CH Murphy Clark-Ullman Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Fluor Constructors International Inc, Foundary Service & Supplies Inc, Gardner Denver Inc, Gould Pumps Incorporated, Greene Tweed & Company Inc, HD Fowler Co Inc, IMO Industries Inc, JT Thorpe & Sons Inc, Konecranes Inc, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Norco Inc, P-G Industries Inc, ViacomCBS Inc, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Pyrotec Incorporated, Crane Co, Schmitt Electric Inc, Square D Company, Spirax Sarco Inc, Triple A Machine Shop Inc, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, Atwood & Morrill Valve Company, Wagstaff Inc and Wells & Wade Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01794
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Filing 75 Mail addressed to Dirk Bernhardt returned as Undeliverable re #56 Standing Order re 28 USC 455, #57 Joint Status Report Order Form. (SB)
November 30, 2023 Filing 74 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (SB) (cc: letter, remand order, and docket sheet to King County Superior Court via USPS)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Parties' #71 Stipulated Motion to Remand. The case is REMANDED to Superior Court of the State of Washington, in and for the County of King. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
November 30, 2023 Filing 72 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,,. ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc Atty Dirk Bernhardt via ad hoc(CDA)
November 30, 2023 Filing 71 Stipulated MOTION to Remand Action to State Court, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dineen, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint; by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Eversole, Sarah)
November 30, 2023 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah)
November 30, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah)
November 30, 2023 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Paramount Global. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Paramount Global. (Marks, Christopher)
November 30, 2023 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sarco International Corporation, Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Investments, Ltd., Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc for Spirax Sarco Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Marks, Christopher)
November 30, 2023 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey D Dunbar on behalf of Defendant Wadeco. (Dunbar, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2023 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Terre Millennium Corporation for JT Thorpe & Sons Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by JT Thorpe & Sons Inc. (Wood, J.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony)
November 29, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Todaro, Anthony)
November 29, 2023 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Inductotherm Corporation. (Furman, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Furman on behalf of Defendant Inductotherm Corporation. (Furman, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Corneil on behalf of Defendant Fraser-Edwards Company. (Corneil, David)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/20/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/3/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 29, 2023 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pyrotec Incorporated. (Daywitt, Jason)
November 29, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason H Daywitt on behalf of Defendant Pyrotec Incorporated. (Daywitt, Jason)
November 29, 2023 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Uhle, Megan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Uhle on behalf of Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Uhle, Megan)
November 29, 2023 Case Reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (MW)
November 29, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to the case. (MW)
November 28, 2023 Filing 51 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission for Kathryn Johnson of Rizzo Bosworth Eraut, PC for Defendant Baker Perkins, Inc.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc via ad hoc to attorney) (RE)
November 28, 2023 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Redco Corporation. (Shaw, G)
November 28, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Redco Corporation. (Shaw, G)
November 28, 2023 Filing 48 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court and federal court jury demands on file. (RE) (Main Document 48 replaced on 11/28/2023) (RE).
November 28, 2023 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC. (Meyer, Justin)
November 28, 2023 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by York International Corporation. (Berlinger, Marisa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND Attorney Justin Leslie Meyer added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft) by Aurora Pump Company.(Meyer, Justin)
November 28, 2023 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Carrier Corporation. (Berlinger, Marisa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Gardner Denver Inc.(Bosworth, Claude)
November 28, 2023 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Bosworth, Claude)
November 28, 2023 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Flowserve US Inc.. (Reynolds, Rachel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Armstrong Global Holdings, Inc. for Armstrong International, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rachel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings for American Optical Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by American Optical Corporation. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa A Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant American Optical Corporation. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
November 28, 2023 Attorneys Daniel Allen Womac and Barry N. Mesher added for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc; per #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). (MW)
November 28, 2023 Attorneys Maxwell A Weseman and Erin P Fraser added for Armstrong International Inc; per #14 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
November 28, 2023 Attorney J. Scott Wood and Zackary Paal added for JT Thorpe & Sons Inc; per #22 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
November 28, 2023 Attorneys Erin P Fraser and Patrick G Lynch added for Flowserve US Inc; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
November 28, 2023 Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
November 27, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claude Bosworth on behalf of Defendant Baker Perkins, Inc.. (Bosworth, Claude)
November 27, 2023 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by WT/HRC Corporation. (Morgan, Shaun)
November 27, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant WT/HRC Corporation. (Morgan, Shaun)
November 27, 2023 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent G.K. Enterprises, Inc. for Whiting Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Whiting Corporation. (Morgan, Shaun)
November 27, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Whiting Corporation. (Morgan, Shaun)
November 27, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
November 27, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Louis Steffan, IV on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Rawlings. (Steffan, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for FMC Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by FMC Corporation. (Hanson, Lorianne)
November 27, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal,, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Lorianne Hanson added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft) by FMC Corporation.(Hanson, Lorianne)
November 27, 2023 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Gould Pumps, Incorporated. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Gould Pumps, Incorporated. (Berlinger, Marisa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint; by Gould Pumps, Incorporated.(Berlinger, Marisa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marisa Berlinger on behalf of Defendant Gould Pumps, Incorporated. (Berlinger, Marisa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katryn Ann Newton on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Rawlings. (Newton, Katryn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Casey Dineen on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Rawlings. (Dineen, Daniel)
November 27, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Meredith B Good on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Rawlings. (Good, Meredith)
November 22, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Virginia Leeper on behalf of Defendant JT THORPE & SONS, INC.. (Leeper, Virginia)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by P-G Industries, Inc.. (Leeper, Virginia)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Virginia Leeper on behalf of Defendant P-G Industries, Inc.. (Leeper, Virginia)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by C.H. Murphy / Clark-Ullman, Inc.. (Leeper, Virginia)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Virginia Leeper on behalf of Defendant C.H. Murphy / Clark-Ullman, Inc.. (Leeper, Virginia)
November 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Marks, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global. (Marks, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rachel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Wagstaff, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rachel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Crown Holdings Inc. for CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY. (Johnson, Malika)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal,, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Malika Johnson added to party CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY(pty:dft) by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY.(Johnson, Malika)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Reynolds, Rachel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent GT Global Holdings, Inc. for Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Babbitt, Diane)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel A Rubin on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC.. (Rubin, Rachel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Jenkins Bros. (Bosworth, Claude)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claude Bosworth on behalf of Defendant Jenkins Bros. (Bosworth, Claude)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claude Bosworth on behalf of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Bosworth, Claude)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments (No. 8) Limited for Valves and Controls US, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Valves and Controls US, Inc.. (Kopij, Dana)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc.. (Kopij, Dana)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Defendant Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Babbitt, Diane)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff attached as separate document; from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-19982-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8248889) Attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt added to party Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.(pty:dft) filed by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David P. Sargent, Jr., #3 Exhibit Pleadings from State Court, #4 Exhibit Notice to Clerk of Removal, #5 Exhibit Service to Greene Tweed, #6 Jury Demand)(Babbitt, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawlings v. American Optical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rawlings
Represented By: Daniel Casey Dineen
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Represented By: Katryn Ann Newton
Represented By: Meredith B Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Kyle J. Rekofke
Represented By: Marissa A Alkhazov
Represented By: Midori R Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Justin Leslie Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Perkins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Murphy / Clark-Ullman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-G Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Represented By: Ryan James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inductotherm Corporation
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Amy Craft
Represented By: Christopher Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Amy Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pfizer inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: G William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc.
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagstaff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A. Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Corporation
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT/HRC Corporation
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Tool and Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boss Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., sued as successor in interest to MUNDET CORK COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundry Service & Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser-Edwards Company
Represented By: David Corneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Fowler Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT THORPE & SONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONECRANES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYROTEC IN CORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHMITT ELECTRIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPANCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WADECO
Represented By: Jeffrey D Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Tool and Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Maxwell A Wesemann
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Perkins Inc
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Murphy Clark-Ullman Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Represented By: Barry N. Mesher
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Patrick G Lynch
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundary Service & Supplies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company Inc
Represented By: Cassandra Ekure
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Fowler Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT Thorpe & Sons Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konecranes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P-G Industries Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Virginia Leeper
Represented By: Zackary Paal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Adam DeSipio
Represented By: Stephen H Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyrotec Incorporated
Represented By: Jason H Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmitt Electric Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Daniel Allen Womac
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Valve Company
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagstaff Inc
Represented By: Maxwell A Wesemann
Represented By: Chuqiao Wang
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells & Wade Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?