Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust et al v. Cascade Flooring of Thurston County LLC et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Northwest Floor Covering Industry Association and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Defendant: Cascade Flooring of Thurston County LLC, Erik Wayne Worden and Does & Roes I-X
Case Number: 2:2023cv01802
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Cascade Flooring of Thurston County LLC on 12/11/2023 (Smith, Wesley)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/25/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2024, Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Erik Wayne Worden, on behalf of Erik Wayne Worden, on 12/28/2023. (Smith, Wesley)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter, : Entry stricken, docketed in error (CDA)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cascade Flooring of Thurston County, LLC, Erik Wayne Worden (Attachments: #1 Summons) (MG)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 DISREGARD/ docketed in error Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MG) Modified on 11/28/2023 strike entry, docketed in error. (CDA).
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Northwest Floor Covering Industry Association. (Smith, Wesley)
November 22, 2023 District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (MG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Cascade Flooring of Thurston County, LLC, Erik Wayne Worden (Receipt # AWAWDC-8250642) Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Allied Trades District Council No. 5(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Northwest Floor Covering Industry Association(pty:pla) filed by Northwest Floor Covering Industry Association, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Smith, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust et al v. Cascade Flooring of Thurston County LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Floor Covering Industry Association
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Trades District Council No 5
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Flooring of Thurston County LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Wayne Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does & Roes I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?