Johnson v. Nordstrom et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Johnson
Defendant: Nordstrom, Julie and Will
Case Number: 2:2023cv01813
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # SEA 200003522), filed by Amanda Johnson. (SS)
November 28, 2023 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 402, receipt number SEA 200003522. (RE)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/27/2023 to file IFP application or submit the filing fee. (cc via USPS) (RE)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint, Proposed Motion for Extra Time, Summons, and Civil Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff Amanda Johnson. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion for Extra Time, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Nordstrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?